Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Guardians of the Bay of Islands Incorporated
Nga Kaiawhi o Nga Kaitiaki o Ipipiri / Project Island Song
CC25193
9429043052875
Registered

Registration details

2/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 142
Russell
0242
5 Pitt Street
Russell 0202
Russell
0202

Charity's other details

0220110473


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, support and encourage the conservation, protection and enhancement of native biodiversity of the Bay of Islands.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Undertakes restoration work - pest control, weed busting, tree planting, species re-introductions and education.)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 29/12/2023 $602,124 $402,044 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/12/2022 $309,328 $238,463 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/12/2021 $336,838 $346,679 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/01/2021 $192,842 $173,592 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 29/12/2019 $234,984 $234,788 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $170,649 $176,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $186,984 $177,161 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 30/11/2016 $233,350 $231,807 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 5/12/2015 $205,059 $203,097 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 24/12/2014 $123,964 $122,675 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shelley Arlidge Arlidge Secretary 1/11/2023
Andre P Witehira Witehira Committe member 1/07/2023
Mary Jaqueline Moore Treasurer 1/11/2020
Rachael Biggins Committee member 3/11/2019
William Robert Fuller chair person 2/11/2017
Michell Elboz Chair person 12/10/2016
Sarah Knight committee member 12/10/2016
Arana Rewha Committee Member 9/06/2015
Andrea Margaret Sim Committee Member 20/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nadia Lehmann Committee 29/05/2024
Thomas Reginald Lindesay Committee Member 1/09/2023
Fleur Barbara Corbett Chairperson 1/02/2023
Richard Moses Witehira Committee Member 31/10/2021
Rodney Elliott Brown Committee Member 18/08/2021
Jill Toplis Committee 12/08/2019
Bev Sharpe Treasurer 30/12/2018
Debby Potts Committee 20/11/2018
John Martin Committe 2/11/2017
Theresa Vujcich Committee 20/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/05/2024 NOC027
9/05/2024 NOC026
14/02/2024 NOC024
5/10/2021 NOC020
15/07/2021 NOC019
29/05/2021 NOC018
29/05/2021 NOC017
4/11/2020 NOC015
9/11/2019 NOC013
12/05/2017 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.