Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


InsideOUT Kōaro
CC48531
9429043326136
Registered

Registration details

18/10/2012
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
QSA Network Aotearoa 18/10/2012
InsideOUT Kōaro 14/05/2015

Address for service

Level 3, Anvil House
138 Wakefield Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

https://facebook.com/insideoutkoaro
https://twitter.com/insideoutkoaro
https://instagram.com/insideoutkoaro


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Vision: All rainbow young people in Aotearoa New Zealand have a sense of safety and belonging in their schools and communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Rainbow/LGBTQIA+ young people)

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public, Queer youth and allies

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Rainbow Violence Prevention Network (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 14/06/2024 23/05/2024 $1,606,004 $1,414,972 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 18/04/2023 $1,184,424 $1,022,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 28/02/2022 24/03/2022 $363,781 $318,701 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 2/12/2020 $347,146 $235,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 1/10/2019 $124,885 $116,081 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $129,327 $138,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $116,535 $99,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $76,103 $42,574 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 26/09/2015 $28,975 $21,889 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $26,303 $10,827 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2021 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amy Ross Executive Advisor 26/03/2024
Jack Ruddenklau Trustee 26/03/2024
Juan Cleghorn Trustee 26/03/2024
Natalie McDonald Trustee 26/03/2024
Kaela Mary Stodart Secretary 26/09/2023
Maddison Anderson Trustee 26/09/2023
Tabitha Besley Managing Director 26/09/2023
Ilana Seager van Dyk Executive Advisor 25/07/2023
Shiyi Redpath Executive Advisor 25/07/2023
Kiefer Hunt Treasurer 25/10/2022
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cameron Kapua-Morrell Trustee 26/03/2024
Becca Harvey Executive Advisor 19/12/2023
Rox Soriano Trustee 19/12/2023
Willow Bailey Trustee 28/11/2023
Tayla Dickinson Trustee 25/07/2023
Dany Miller-Kareko Trustee 30/05/2023
Julia de Bres Executive Advisor 18/04/2023
Stella Ivory Trustee 25/10/2022
Allanah Elvy-Arnold Executive Advisor 29/03/2022
Rosie Melchers Trustee 16/12/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/10/2023 NOC041
11/10/2023 NOC040
18/04/2023 NOC039
22/03/2023 NOC037
19/04/2022 NOC036
24/03/2022 NOC035
24/02/2022 NOC033
3/12/2021 NOC032
29/08/2021 NOC031
22/07/2021 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.