pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Creative Waikato
CC49075
9429043323043
Registered

Registration details

14/12/2012
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 9304
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
11 Garden Place
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

+64212792338
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/CreativeWaikato/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/CreativeWaikato?lang=en
https://www.instagram.com/creativewaikato/?hl=en


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance education specifically in all forms of the field of art, for the regions public benefit, not for private profit. To promote, encourage, advance and develop the arts, awareness, understanding and appreciation thereof by all people in the region and in New Zealand To increase opportunities for people in the region to have access to the arts, so that the cultural heritage of the region and of NZ is enriched.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The governing Trust Board has a minimum of 7 trustees and a maximum of 9 trustees. The term of appointment of trustees will be for a period of 3 years, except in the case of the first trustees. Any trustee will be eligible for re-appointment for up to a maximum of three consecutive terms. The trust Board has appointed a CEO. A further 7 staff are employed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 3/07/2019 $742,546 $721,107
30/09/2018 2/08/2018 $725,982 $680,496
30/09/2017 4/09/2017 $681,246 $604,498
30/09/2016 22/09/2016 $575,919 $557,629
30/09/2015 31/08/2015 $576,435 $527,667
30/09/2014 19/06/2014 $560,144 $519,074
31/12/2013 15/11/2013 $285,544 $252,840

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Samuel Jacques Annals Cunnane Trustee 5/08/2019
Brian Squair Deputy Chair 1/07/2018
Rachel Balme Trustee 1/07/2018
Lauren Hughes Trustee 2/02/2018
Scott Ratuki Trustee 2/02/2018
Amanda Hema Chair 27/06/2014
Nick Johnston Trustee 27/06/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Muna Wharawhara Trustee 31/05/2019
Margaret Moore Chairperson 1/02/2019
Henriata Nicholas Trustee 5/10/2018
Bruce Sheridan Deputy Chair 1/06/2018
Cheryl Reynolds Trustee 1/06/2018
Meenal Duggal Trustee 5/05/2017
Christopher Williams Chariman 31/03/2016
Charlotte Isaac Trustee 1/07/2015
Gail Campbell Trustee 1/02/2015
Carole Shepheard Trustee 27/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/08/2018 NOC007
15/09/2015 NOC003
15/09/2014 NOC002
19/06/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents