pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Adventist Development and Relief Agency
CC42116
9429042572374
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 94200
Howick
Auckland
2145
18 Fencible Drive
Howick
Auckland
2014

Charity's other details

09 262 5620
09 262 5621

Oceania

Fiji, Papua New Guinea, Vanuatu

Asia

Bangladesh, Cambodia, Philippines, Vietnam


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Development and Relief Agency

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, International activities, Economic development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Denison Grellmann CEO 12/06/2016
Graeme Lindan Drinkall Chief Financial Officer 25/01/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bradley Kemp Chairperson 28/07/2018
Gregory Young Vice Chairperson 31/12/2016
Leanne Davies Committee Member 31/12/2016
Paul Timothy Hopson Committee Member 31/12/2016
Stephen Andrews Committee Member 31/12/2016
Matthew Siliga Secretary 30/11/2015
Jerome Paul Matthews Chairperson 31/08/2013
Clinton Ray Rappell Secretary 31/01/2013
Victoria Jean Fray Committee Member 31/07/2012
Alan Grieg Fletcher Committee Member 31/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/10/2018 NOC008
16/01/2012 NOC004
27/04/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents