pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Youth Arts New Zealand
CC56306
9429047204270
Registered

Registration details

7/02/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 37976
Parnell
Auckland
1052
Level 4, 156 Parnell Road
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

+642102964421
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/youthartsnz/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/YouthArtsNZ
https://nz.linkedin.com/company/yanz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Youth Arts New Zealand (YANZ) is Aotearoa’s leading youth-led organisation generating equitable opportunities for rangatahi to explore creativity, both as a career and as a means of self-expression. Our vision is for an Aotearoa where every young New Zealander knows the worth of their creative identity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Youth Arts New Zealand (YANZ) is a charitable trust governed by a Board of Trustees and comprised of a team of employees, contractors and volunteers, led by the Chief Executive. YANZ is a creative social enterprise, and strives to generate the majority of its revenue through trading services and attaining project funding.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2019 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2023 11/10/2023 $401,045 $433,286
31/12/2022 21/12/2022 $175,345 $211,173
30/11/2021 15/11/2021 $189,637 $110,985
30/09/2020 14/07/2020 $20,442 $19,055
30/09/2019 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kauri Tearaura Trustee 7/09/2023
Zak Vin Devey Trustee 7/09/2023
Kelly-Ann Maxwell Trustee 1/06/2022
Samantha Bettina Witters Vice Chair 12/06/2020
Tania Marie Jones Chair 12/06/2020
Matthew Oliver John Goldsworthy CEO & Founding Trustee 21/12/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ian Alexander Musson Trustee 19/10/2023
Stacey Briar Ogg Trustee 17/05/2023
Tosswell Grumley Trustee 17/05/2023
Josephine Ann McNaught Trustee 14/12/2022
Harrison Courtney Sugrue Creative Director & Co-founder 17/06/2020
Zak Vin Devey Director of Communications and Content, Co-founder 17/06/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/10/2023 NOC014
21/09/2023 NOC012
13/08/2023 NOC011
22/12/2022 NOC010
10/06/2022 NOC008
10/06/2022 NOC007
4/02/2022 NOC006
15/11/2021 NOC005
2/08/2021 NOC003
15/02/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents