Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whakatipu Wildlife Trust
CC54794
9429046225825
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2017
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Wakatipu Wildlife Trust 22/09/2017
Whakatipu Wildlife Trust 8/09/2021

Address for service

PO Box 690
Queenstown
9348
60 Cunninghams Drive
Jacks Point 9371
Jacks Point
9371

Charity's other details

0272201188
https://www.facebook.com/WakatipuWildlifeTrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Encouraging the establishment of a network of projects designed to make the greater Lake Wakatipu area predator free and thus enable birds and other native wildlife to flourish.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

We are based in Queenstown and our focus is on acting as an umbrella organisation supporting localised predator elimination groups through out the greater Lake Wakatipu region. We have seven trustees as per our Trust Deed and they carry out the work of the Trust. We also additionally have a chartered accountant as treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/07/2023 $156,028 $112,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 6/07/2022 $119,159 $67,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 26/10/2021 $106,097 $74,584 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/10/2020 29/10/2020 $151,018 $96,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 30/10/2019 $93,598 $73,653 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 26/11/2018 $44,598 $13,359 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Craig Paterson Trustee 4/07/2022
Christina Becker-Fifield Trustee 4/07/2022
Daniel Vincent John Sweeney Trustee 29/11/2020
Nicky Jane Gray Trustee 29/11/2020
Dawn Alice Palmer Trustee 29/10/2020
David John Penrose Trustee 25/10/2018
Philip James Green Trustee 25/10/2018
Benjamin Ivan Perchik Trustee 2/06/2017
Warren Richard Skerrett Trustee 2/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Penelope Jane Clark Trustee 31/03/2023
Simon Gregg Edmunds Trustee 31/01/2023
Philippa Jane Speedy Trustee 24/12/2022
Paul Brendan Kavanagh Trustee 11/10/2021
Thomas McNeil Pryde Trustee 6/08/2021
Paul Alexis Griffin Trustee 25/10/2018
Wulf Solter Trustee 25/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/04/2023 NOC014
27/03/2023 NOC013
11/07/2022 NOC012
11/10/2021 NOC009
8/09/2021 NOC008
27/07/2021 NOC007
4/11/2020 NOC006
3/12/2018 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.