pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The SPCA Trust
CC21167
9429043033942
Registered

Registration details

14/02/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Auckland SPCA Trust 15/02/2008
The SPCA Trust 24/10/2017

Address for service

PO Box 15349
New Lynn
Auckland
0640
199C Lincoln Road
Henderson
Auckland
0610

Charity's other details

(09) 825 1802


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The protection of animals and the prevention of cruelty to animals

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Investments)

Care / protection of animals

Fund-raising, Investments

Other (please state)

(Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated and the Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Auckland Incorporated)

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 1/02/2023 $5,000 $10,383
31/12/2021 21/11/2021 $3,132,572 $34,738,954
31/12/2020 25/11/2020 $1,269,352 $1,090,189
31/12/2019 14/11/2019 $2,415,852 $590,265
31/12/2018 3/12/2018 $1,717,838 $1,089,752
31/12/2017 21/11/2017 $1,893,382 $1,073,180
31/12/2016 16/01/2017 $1,022,222 $78,012
31/12/2015 17/12/2015 $5,038,010 $64,713
31/12/2014 27/08/2014 $4,905,854 $59,883
31/12/2013 2/09/2013 $4,942,476 $1,114,928

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Benjamin D'Arcy Palmer Trustee 20/07/2016
Gordon Trainer Trustee 7/11/2011
Mark Vickerman Trustee 29/03/1987

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Don Bendall Trustee 4/03/2022
Bob Kerridge Trustee 5/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/03/2022 NOC015
24/10/2018 NOC010
21/02/2018 NOC009
21/07/2016 NOC006
8/11/2011 NOC003
14/07/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents