Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Diving New Zealand (Incorporated)
Diving New Zealand
CC42843
9429043079018
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 12101
Thorndon
Wellington
6144

Charity's other details

027 485 8888
www.facebook.com/divingnewzealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Diving New Zealand Inc's mission is to lead, promote, foster and encourage the sport of springboard and platform diving in all its forms and to create an environment in which divers, coaches and officials can participate and perform to their full potential.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

National Sporting Organisation for the sport of springboard and platform diving.

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, Divers

Entity Structure

Board Structure - Our constitutional rules state that we must have a board comprising six members - four of whom are appointed by delegates at the AGM on the recommendation of the Selection Panel, and two members elected by the delegates at the AGM. The term of two appointed members and one elected member expires at the AGM, although all are eligible for reappointment or election as the case may be. A chairperson is elected by board members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 23/04/2023 $202,204 $252,580 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 11/06/2022 $101,335 $98,342 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 27/06/2021 $63,064 $46,522 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 4/06/2020 $371,432 $327,394 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 15/07/2019 $50,329 $47,233 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/04/2018 $68,841 $74,029 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 18/05/2017 $68,490 $46,253 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 20/03/2016 $74,840 $63,484 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 23/03/2015 $161,988 $159,511 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul McFadzien Board Member 6/04/2023
Sai Bedekar Board Member 6/04/2023
Cassie Death Board Member 9/04/2021
Jendi Paterson Chair 4/04/2020
Alison Derbyshire Deputy Chair 30/07/2019
Michael McCredie Finance 31/08/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lindsay Stone Board Member 31/03/2023
Lisa Barrow Board Member 25/03/2022
Cassie Death Board Member 28/06/2021
Alison Storey Board Member 9/04/2021
Maria Gabriella Davila Board Member 4/04/2020
Kelly Sutton Board Member 10/12/2019
Steve Gladding Board Member 22/10/2019
Maria Marull Board Member 26/06/2019
Simon James Latimer Board Member 1/03/2019
Matthew Nutter Board Member 26/05/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/04/2023 NOC021
28/06/2021 NOC018
28/06/2021 NOC017
8/04/2020 NOC015
3/09/2018 NOC013
3/09/2018 NOC012
29/07/2018 NOC011
24/03/2015 NOC007
28/03/2013 AR006
30/03/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.