pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pacific Inc. Limited
CC49514
9429030155268
Registered

Registration details

22/07/2013
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 857 1200


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cedric Eddie Tuiavii Director 30/09/2021
Josiah Tualamali’i Director 1/10/2015
Caren Rangi Director 1/07/2014
Julie Nelson Director 16/07/2013
Shelley Campbell Director 16/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mary English Director 25/11/2020
Francis Agnew Director 24/06/2020
Monique Faleafa Director 4/04/2018
Tracey Dent Company Secretary 2/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/10/2021 NOC009
11/12/2020 NOC007
3/07/2020 NOC006
12/12/2017 NOC005
5/11/2015 NOC004
30/07/2014 NOC003
2/05/2014 NOC002
2/05/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents