pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nelson Musical Theatre Incorporated
CC29838
9429042768180
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 103
Nelson
7040
95 Atawhai Drive
Nelson
7010

Charity's other details

03 5488 556
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nelsonmusicaltheatre
https://www.instagram.com/nelsonmusicaltheatre/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Nelson Musical Theatre provides opportunities for members of our community to participate in amateur musical theatre productions as well acting as a hub for Nelson theatre and the wider arts community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Training for actors, stagehands, musicians, and other back stage personnel in all aspects of staging a show)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation, Singing/Training

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Nelson Musical Theatre is an incorporated society that is managed by an elected committee of its members and is governed by its rules of operation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 9/05/2022 $29,350 $97,674
30/06/2021 1/06/2021 $63,886 $97,676
30/06/2020 7/07/2020 $54,804 $67,819
30/06/2019 6/06/2019 $83,117 $87,529
30/06/2018 1/07/2018 $259,079 $193,061
30/06/2017 1/06/2017 $76,402 $79,720
30/06/2016 27/06/2016 $127,746 $92,581
30/06/2015 1/03/2016 $21,463 $34,096
30/06/2014 23/09/2014 $36,200 $34,454
30/06/2013 2/07/2014 $26,520 $37,910

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gretchen Noel Howard Committee 29/03/2022
Ian Thomas Goode Committee 29/03/2022
Mark Anthony Nicholls Membership Secretary 29/03/2022
Michaela Roxanne Smith Committee 29/03/2022
Phillipa Louise Collins Committee 29/03/2022
Timothy Bernard Nicholls Committee 29/03/2022
Joanna Millett Secretary 29/09/2021
Mark Field Treasurer 1/06/2021
Samuel Mark Nicholls Vice President 15/11/2020
Robert (Robbie) Keith Burns President 29/03/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aimee Rhiannon Borlese Committee 29/03/2022
Francesca Anne Beckett Committee 29/03/2022
Megan Slater Committee member 16/02/2022
Katie Adela Wolicki committee 29/09/2021
Jane Elizabeth Baken Vice President 13/09/2021
Katrina Aileen Scott Secretary 28/08/2021
Jane Christie Pascoe-Gregory Committee 10/08/2021
Peta Spooner Committee Member 14/07/2021
Lindsey Jane Benbow Treasurer 1/06/2021
Kim Elizabeth Robertson Committee 31/12/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/04/2022 NOC027
20/04/2022 NOC024
13/04/2022 NOC023
27/03/2022 NOC022
27/10/2021 NOC021
5/10/2021 NOC020
1/10/2021 NOC019
29/09/2021 NOC018
29/09/2021 NOC017
29/09/2021 NOC016

Charity Documents