Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Greenstone Doors Charitable Trust
Greenstone Doors
CC50164
9429043279142
Registered

Registration details

15/01/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 30959
Lower Hutt
5040
194 Naenae Road
Naenae
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

04 566 5037
www.facebook.com/Greenstone-Doors-351245588346107/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

“To promote respect for life and positive outcomes for individuals and families experiencing difficult circumstances as they enter a new life experience.” In particular the Trust: • Provides education, counselling, resources and support through an independent network of counselling and support professionals; • Operates a pregnancy centre in the Hutt Valley, providing one-to-one pregnancy counselling, resources and information; • Provides free baby clothing for newborns to one-year-olds; • Provides post-abortion counselling and support; • Facilitates educational workshops and presentations, and other services to support individuals and families through pregnancy, into childbirth and beyond.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

GOVERNANCE GSD has a Board of Trustees who provide guidance and set the strategic direction for the organisation. The Board meet regularly (bi-monthly) to review financial and operational management reports. • Specific planning meetings are held 2-3 times per year in addition to the regular management oversight meetings. SERVICE DELIVERY GSD employs a permanent part-time General Manager who coordinates a network of volunteers GSD employes a permanent part-time Office Manager

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 7/09/2023 $187,473 $263,704 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $364,009 $305,191 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 3/08/2021 $247,499 $223,396 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 18/08/2020 $94,484 $123,904 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 7/07/2019 $124,284 $117,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $104,313 $100,250 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 16/09/2017 $93,770 $78,363 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 22/07/2016 $64,911 $55,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 27/08/2015 $41,479 $56,376 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 9/09/2014 $40,086 $10,515 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Darren James Godden Trustee 12/01/2024
Suzanne O'Rourke Trustee 3/01/2014
Wendy Hill Trustee 3/01/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Monica Devine Trustee 12/01/2024
Maxwell John Shierlaw Trustee 8/09/2023
Catherine Mary Quirke Trustee 10/03/2020
Michelle Holswich Trustee 10/03/2020
Sharon Blake Trustee 10/03/2020
Aren Valentine Trustee 11/07/2019
Marcelo Esparas Trustee 12/11/2016
Carey Buck Trustee 21/07/2016
Joanne Byrne Trustee 21/07/2016
Ayi Cabanatan Treasurer 31/03/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/01/2024 NOC021
11/02/2023 NOC019
15/05/2022 NOC017
19/03/2020 NOC014
22/02/2019 NOC012
7/09/2018 NOC011
17/11/2016 NOC008
15/11/2016 NOC007
11/04/2016 NOC005
11/04/2016 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.