pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Chinese Association Incorporated
CC38781
9429042916697
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 27016
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Level 1
245 High Street
Hutt Central
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 5692683


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Commitment to providing sporting, cultural, social and education activities to members of the Chinese community throughout the year.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Arts/Culture/Sports), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sport / recreation

Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Not for profit incorporated society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 2/11/2021 $3,481 $2,856
30/09/2020 19/10/2021 $3,753 $3,043
30/09/2019 15/11/2019 $69,471 $55,198
30/09/2018 5/03/2019 $5,271 $4,617
30/09/2017 5/03/2019 $6,465 $5,574
30/09/2016 19/12/2016 $5,150 $3,349
30/09/2015 9/12/2015 $9,630 $10,702
30/09/2014 20/05/2015 $7,263 $7,659
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $6,670 $4,940

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Iris Lu Treasurer 28/07/2019
Gordon Wu Committee Member 31/07/2016
Justine Kohing Committee Member 31/07/2016
Harvey Wu Committee Member 29/07/2007
Jack On Ng Committee Member 29/07/2007
Lynette Shum Committee Member 29/07/2007
Steven Young Committee Member 29/07/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Luke Qin President 31/07/2021
Peter Wong Committee Member 31/10/2020
Lisa Chen Secretary 28/07/2019
Rachel Qi Committee Member 28/07/2019
Rita Chen Committee Member 29/07/2018
Esther Fung Vice-President 17/08/2016
Anita King Committee Member 10/08/2016
Kirsten Wong Secretary 31/03/2012
Richard Ng Committee Member 31/03/2012
Nigel Murphy Committee Member 8/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/11/2021 NOC012
5/03/2019 NOC006
18/09/2012 AR005
17/01/2012 AR004
4/04/2011 AR003
19/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents