pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
CC24673
9429043173440
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

26 Moana Street
Whanganui East
Whanganui
4500

Charity's other details

06 343 3157


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To work together with families, all medical professionals and local authorities to ensure ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and cultural background in the Wanganui Health Board area receive free of charge, the best care and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, People of all ages

Entity Structure

Members of the Wanganui Society Incorporated elect President, Vice president, Secretary, Treasurer and a committee of up to four financial ordinary or life members to manage the society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 Processing $827 $1,263
30/09/2020 8/07/2020 $826 $1,055
30/09/2019 8/08/2019 $2,272 $1,004
30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $2,528 $1,478
30/09/2017 5/10/2017 $3,261 $1,480
30/09/2016 22/09/2016 $1,934 $1,624
30/09/2015 11/09/2015 $1,956 $1,604
30/09/2014 7/08/2014 $1,709 $1,399
30/09/2013 7/06/2013 $1,980 $1,549
30/09/2012 5/06/2012 $1,195 $802

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Frances Ngarie Wylie Treasurer 30/04/2019
John Cuitanovich Committee Member 30/04/2019
Marion davenport Secretary 30/04/2019
Allison Furlong Committee 15/08/2018
David McCall Vice president 15/08/2018
Janet O'Neill President 15/08/2018
Brian Rex Winter Committee 4/05/2009
Lesley Dawn George Committee 4/05/2009
Maureen Gleeson Committee 18/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Edmond O'Neill Treasurer 18/06/2020
Patricia Sheridan Vice President 16/06/2020
Lyn May McKenna Committee 10/07/2018
Alison Angus Vice President 22/03/2018
Ernie Nowell Secretary 22/03/2018
Janet O'Neill President 1/05/2017
Mary McKernan Committee 1/05/2017
Bernard Patrick Sheridan Committee 2/05/2016
Lynette Nay McKenna Secretary 2/05/2016
Ailsa Crawford Stewrt Patron 5/05/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/06/2013 AR006
5/06/2012 AR005
28/06/2010 AR003
5/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents