Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


International Student Ministries of New Zealand Incorporated
CC26016
9429042964278
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12089
Inner City
Palmerston North
4444
591 Dominion Road
Balmoral
Mount Eden
Auckland
1041

Charity's other details

06 241 8426
https://www.facebook.com/groups/24941859628/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Helping international students in New Zealand become life-long followers of Jesus Christ, equipping and enabling them to impact their communities and nations for Him.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Education / training / research, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(International Students studying in New Zealand), Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Society Members elect five to seven Board members to manage its affairs. In turn the Board appoints a National Director to supervise day-to-day activities of the Society on behalf of the Board and Society members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/09/2023 $608,327 $593,283 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $610,204 $578,558 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/11/2021 24/11/2021 $650,238 $596,049 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 13/11/2020 $593,817 $572,102 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $631,011 $607,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $521,393 $542,114 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/10/2017 $526,764 $533,722 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 26/09/2016 $563,518 $546,605 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 10/08/2015 $587,955 $549,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 16/09/2014 $571,016 $597,203 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Akira Doi Board Member 23/09/2023
Jason Chang Board Member 23/09/2023
Mario Garcia Board Member 23/09/2023
Ernest Sulivan Board Member 20/11/2021
Tony Rasmussen Board Member 20/11/2021
Christina Baird Board Member 8/06/2021
Andrew Lim Chairman 23/09/2017
Allen Tai Mee Tie National Director 1/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brent Norrish Board Member 26/03/2023
Gabrielle Nguyen Board Member 11/11/2022
Jonathan Peacey Board Member 27/11/2021
Andrew Butcher Board Member 27/02/2021
Sarah Field Board Member 27/02/2021
Peter Aaron Munro Board Member 21/12/2019
Yvette Butcher Board Secretary 1/07/2019
Palatasa Havea Board Member 18/11/2017
Jim Chew Board Member 17/06/2017
Janeen Mills Acting National Director 30/04/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/10/2023 NOC045
25/09/2023 NOC042
7/07/2023 NOC041
24/08/2022 NOC039
1/07/2022 NOC038
12/04/2022 NOC036
16/12/2021 NOC034
16/12/2021 NOC033
25/08/2021 NOC031
24/08/2021 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.