Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Wilding Foundation
CC39420
9429043098804
Deregistered
05/06/2019

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Wilding Foundation at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

21/04/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 8020
Riccarton
Christchurch
8440

Charity's other details


Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Marshall Islands, Micronesia, Nauru, Palau, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To devote and apply both capital and income of the Trust Fund to or for nay educational, religious or other Charitable Purposes which are from time to time selected by the Trustees, and which are valid Charitable Purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Makes grants through scholarships to individuals), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, People with disabilities, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Trust created by the Charitable Trust Deed of Wilding Foundation dated 24 February 2009

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 12/02/2018 $121 $125 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 14/09/2016 $115 $151 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 12/11/2015 $50 $311 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 22/04/2014 $0 $639 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 15/04/2013 $292 $666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2012 30/09/2012 4/04/2012 $10,477 $9,778 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 2/05/2011 $2,076 $1,511 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 2/05/2011 $3,441 $3,410 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Rose Wilding Trustee 24/02/2009
Kenneth John Lord Trustee 24/02/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Margaret Hilary Thomsen Trustee 6/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/05/2011 AR003
2/05/2011 AR002
16/07/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.