pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Asia Evangelistic Fellowship New Zealand Incorporated
AEF NZ
CC38148
9429042580485
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 15212
New Lynn
Auckland
640

Charity's other details

09 832 0022

Oceania

Australia

Asia

China, India, Malaysia, Nepal, Philippines, Singapore


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, promulgate, teach and practice the precepts and doctrines of the christian faith.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, International activities, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 4/05/2022 $6,320 $13,476
30/09/2020 8/01/2021 $6,916 $621
30/09/2019 1/11/2019 $6,129 $6,935
30/09/2018 1/11/2019 $5,165 $14,357
30/09/2017 4/10/2017 $6,508 $1,466
30/09/2016 19/12/2016 $7,236 $4,222
30/09/2015 1/09/2015 $4,977 $5,630
30/09/2014 28/11/2014 $4,862 $7,025
30/09/2013 29/08/2013 $5,159 $2,086

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Balasingam Dhanasingam Treasurer 29/03/2008
Dawood Latif Committee Member 20/02/2000
Adoniram Kumar Chairman 12/06/1987

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Redshaw Secretary 1/04/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/01/2012 AR004

Charity Documents