pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Society of Friends of the Dorothy Neal White Collection Incorporated
Friends of the Dorothy Neal White Collection
CC51738
9429042888932
Registered

Registration details

14/05/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12499
Thorndon
Wellington
6144

Charity's other details

0221659133
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/dnwfriends/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The society which is based in Wellington, New Zealand is associated with The National Library of New Zealand . It was formed in 1983 to support the work of the Dorothy Neal White Collection. In 2005 it was extended to support the National Children’s and Susan Price Collections.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Researchers

Entity Structure

A committee of about six interested members facilitate meetings for members and the public. A research grant is offered and displays of the Dorothy Neal White and associated collections are organised.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 22/06/2019 $1,509 $3,425
30/09/2018 21/07/2018 $1,872 $1,498
30/09/2017 26/06/2017 $1,758 $1,224
30/09/2016 30/06/2016 $1,913 $1,588

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lynne Jackett Committee 20/06/2017
Margaret Hurst Committee 20/06/2017
Chantalle Smith Committee 23/07/2015
Jeffery Thomas Hunt Treasurer 23/07/2015
Kathryn Walls Committee 23/07/2015
Corrina Gordon President 21/05/2013
Mary Skarott Research Librarian 21/05/2013
Barbara Robertson Committee 25/06/2008
Joan McCracken Newsletter 25/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tania Connelly Committee 20/06/2017
Alison Grant Committee 31/03/2016
Audrey Cooper Committee 1/07/2015
Janet Blake Treasurer 1/07/2015
Trevor Mowbray Secretary 1/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/06/2019 NOC007
2/07/2016 NOC004
30/06/2016 NOC002
23/07/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents