pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Statistical Association Incorporated
CC46256
9429042691921
Registered

Registration details

1/03/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 1731
Wellington
6140

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To lead New Zealand to value and make intelligent use of statistical thinking and good statistical practice and to promote research into and the practice and understanding of statistics in New Zealand for the common good.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Membership of the Association is divided into three classes: ordinary members, corporate members, and honorary life members. All members may attend and have voting rights at the Annual General meeting which is held concurrently with the annual conference. Executive office holders such as the President, Secretary and Treasurer are elected at the AGM.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 23/09/2018 $25,225 $16,647
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $65,448 $11,798
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $33,043 $43,909
30/09/2015 10/11/2015 $28,484 $7,490
30/09/2014 31/12/2014 $25,718 $20,363
30/09/2013 29/10/2013 $29,627 $29,140
30/09/2012 11/12/2012 $29,084 $19,096
30/09/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Vanessa Cave Secretary 14/12/2017
Daniel Gerhard Treasurer 29/11/2016
Ian Westbrooke President 29/11/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Haywood Secretary 14/12/2017
Howard Edwards Treasurer 29/11/2016
Martin Hazelton President 29/11/2016
Beatrix Jones Secretary 24/11/2014
James Curran President 24/11/2014
Judi Mcwhirter Treasurer 24/11/2014
Jennifer Brown President 31/08/2011
Richard Penny Secretary 31/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/06/2015 NOC004
22/06/2015 NOC003
14/12/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents