Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Well Women and Family Trust
CC10025
9429042990017
Registered

Registration details

22/02/2007
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
WONS : Nursing, Education and Health promotion services 23/02/2007
Well Women and Family Trust 1/01/2012

Address for service

PO Box 41021
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1440
Flat 14 Ground
49 Sainsbury Road
Mount Albert
Auckland
1025

Charity's other details

(09)8467886


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Well Women and Family Trust are a Not for Profit Charitable Trust founded 28 years ago in response to the Cartwright Enquiry. The vision was then, and still is to improve access to Cervical and Breast Screening, HPV Vaccination and Contraception including LARC. Our organisation achieves this vision by providing community and mobile services (6 clinics per week) across the Auckland region. Our focus is to remove the multitude of barriers that women face in accessing screening services. Another core component of our organsiation is the provision of NZQA and NSU approved Cervical Smear Taker Training. Well Women and Family Trust holds contracts with the Ministry of Health to provide Support to Screening Services, and have secured funding for provision of services till the end of 2024. We also rely on grants to assist us to provide other health promotion and community initiatives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Health Professionals

Entity Structure

The Trust is administered by a Board of Trustees under a Trust Deed. The Board is currently comprised of three Trustees. The Board sets the strategic direction of the Trust, and employs staff to implement this strategy on an operational level. The Clinical Lead and Practice Manager will work in a complementary fashion whose focus will be on the operational aspect of the Trust's work. The Trust also employs ten permanent staff in order to run its operation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 9/06/2023 $980,678 $750,165 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 27/06/2022 $786,933 $738,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 25/05/2021 $723,003 $672,540 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2020 $751,061 $737,350 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 11/06/2019 $758,482 $758,646 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/05/2018 $750,804 $669,926 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/05/2017 $581,748 $590,472 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 27/06/2016 $678,980 $635,285 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 10/06/2015 $696,415 $692,073 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Saman Moeed Trustee 30/10/2019
Marea Topp Trustee 14/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane Piper General Manager/Trustee 21/07/2022
Rebecca Morris Trustee 18/05/2022
Monique Fredatovich Trustee 29/11/2019
Tim Lainson Trustee 14/11/2018
Margaret Ruth Davy Trustee 2/07/2018
Anne Maria Fitisemanu Trustee 23/07/2013
Tim Lainson Trustee 1/06/2013
Hinurewa Te Hau Trustee 29/02/2012
Colin Brian Wilson Trustee 30/11/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/07/2022 NOC023
9/06/2020 NOC019
5/12/2019 NOC018
5/12/2019 NOC017
7/02/2019 NOC015
31/07/2018 NOC014
10/06/2014 NOC011
10/06/2014 NOC010
19/06/2012 NOC006
13/04/2012 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.