Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Saints Alive For Jesus Trust
CC10284
9429043066827
Deregistered
15/08/2013
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.

Below are details of Saints Alive For Jesus Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

16/05/2007
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 15/08/2013 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 16/05/2007

Address for service

PO Box 38060
Parklands
Christchurch
8842
5 Allstone Place
Burwood
Christchurch
8083

Charity's other details

(03) 383 6247
(03) 383 6245


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Other (please state)

(People seeking info on religious groups in NZ), General public, Religious groups


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2012 30/09/2012 7/09/2012 $419 $675 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 10/08/2011 $861 $927 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 24/05/2010 $1,272 $2,265 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2009 30/09/2009 7/07/2009 $2,522 $2,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2008 30/09/2008 19/09/2008 $727 $1,489 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Douglas Prescott Trustee 3/04/2007
Matthew Gray Trustee 3/04/2007
Maxwell Hanson Trustee 3/04/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/09/2012 AR006
10/08/2011 AR005
24/05/2010 AR004
7/07/2009 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.