pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Mother Aubert Home Of Compassion Trust Board
CC10312
9429042784722
Registered

Registration details

20/05/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1474
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
2 Rhine Street
Island Bay
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

04 282 1962

Oceania

Australia, Fiji


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support and continue the works of charity of the Sisters of Compassion supporting the most needy in society

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides Buildings

Social services

Property Management

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The entity is a Trust consisting of the Leadership Team of the Sisters of Compassion and its purpose is to maintain the Mission and charism of the Sisters of Compassion and to fund their works of charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 29/11/2020 $3,824,970 $4,969,821
31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $3,435,894 $3,675,241
31/12/2018 5/12/2018 $3,273,297 $3,520,254
31/12/2017 11/05/2018 $3,486,569 $3,294,613
31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $3,690,910 $3,717,144
31/12/2015 13/01/2016 $3,676,057 $3,656,627
31/12/2014 17/02/2015 $2,719,702 $3,321,007
31/12/2013 22/10/2013 $4,695,000 $6,567,600
31/12/2012 5/11/2012 $3,669,800 $4,544,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Paul Ramsay Trustee 7/10/2019
Nicolette Kathleen Stephens Trustee 1/10/2019
Euan Lindsay Taylor Wright Trustee 2/07/2018
Peter James Connor Trustee 2/07/2018
Margaret Anne Mills Trustee and Chair 9/11/2017
Alisi Paea 'i Vaiola Tu'iPulotu Trustee and Member of the Religious Congregation the Sisters of Compassion 19/10/2017
Susan Cosgrove Trustee 1/07/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gerard Michael McGreevy Chief Executive 30/11/2020
Xiafang Huang Accountant 30/11/2020
Lusiana Raratini Trustee 1/10/2019
Margaret Anne Milla Trustee 9/11/2017
Cicely Elizabeth Hurring Trustee 5/05/2017
Ailsa Georgina Diamond Accountant 30/09/2016
Margaret Anne Mills Trustee 31/12/2015
May Josephine Gorman Trustee 31/12/2015
Henry George Lamont Arnott General Manager 30/09/2014
Annette Marie Green Trustee 1/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2019 NOC019
7/10/2019 NOC018
26/09/2019 NOC017
29/06/2018 NOC015
9/11/2017 NOC013
24/05/2017 NOC012
18/02/2015 NOC010
18/02/2015 NOC009
16/04/2012 NOC004
12/07/2011 NOC003

Charity Documents