Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Neurological Foundation of New Zealand
CC10341
9429042708650
Registered

Registration details

24/05/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 110022
Auckland Hospital
Auckland
1148
66 Grafton Road
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

093097749
https://www.facebook.com/neurologicalfnz/
https://nz.linkedin.com/company/neurological-nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

"To alleviate suffering from diseases and disorders of the brain and nervous system through research and education".

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Health

Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 25/09/2024 $16,548,181 $8,295,296 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 19/09/2023 $3,093,475 $7,296,952 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 31/10/2022 $6,182,788 $10,335,442 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/08/2021 $13,553,348 $7,381,976 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 21/08/2020 $12,946,643 $2,798,430 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 9/07/2019 $10,229,324 $2,864,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 17/07/2018 $12,451,202 $2,221,807 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $15,929,330 $5,316,760 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 7/07/2016 $6,551,661 $4,683,835 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Debbie Snell Council Member 1/12/2023
Matthew Caughey Council Member 1/12/2023
Stephanie Clare Council Member 3/05/2023
Ailsa McGregor Deputy Chair 24/03/2023
Mike Milsom Council Member 24/03/2023
Matthew Slater Chair 3/11/2022
Georgina Hunter Council Member 25/06/2021
Simon John Council Member 19/02/2020
Sonja Clapham Council Member 28/11/2019
Richard Andrew Easton Chief Executive 4/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lisa Smith Council Member 24/06/2024
Cathy Maree Stinear Chair 8/09/2023
Anna Lissaman Council Member 16/08/2023
Barbara Bridger Council Member 17/04/2023
John Kelly Council Member 8/11/2022
James Hellaby Council Member 3/11/2022
James Ring Council Member 8/06/2022
Baden John Ewart Deputy Chair 12/04/2022
Deborah Peters Council member 25/06/2021
Barry Snow Chairman 27/11/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/08/2024 NOC055
24/06/2024 NOC054
18/01/2024 NOC053
20/09/2023 NOC051
23/08/2023 NOC050
10/05/2023 NOC049
20/04/2023 NOC048
5/04/2023 NOC047
9/11/2022 NOC046
4/11/2022 NOC045
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.