Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


True Light FM Incorporated
True Light FM
CC10580
9429043158362
Registered

Registration details

9/07/2007
June 30

Address for service

TRUE LIGHT FM PO Box 4211
Manawatu Mail Centre
Palmerston North
4442
228 Broadway Avenue
Palmerston North 4414
Palmerston North
4414

Charity's other details

0800 878 354


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To supply Biblically based radio programmes and daily devotional content to encourage and help people in their every day living, particularly those that are elderly and incapacitated, or isolated and are unable to attend church services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), provides religious services via radio broadcasting

Religious activities

Social services, People with disabilities, Broadcast services

Older people

Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Incarcerated/hospital patients

Entity Structure

The affairs of the Society is governed by a Board representing the membership of the Society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 26/12/2023 $8,508 $8,730 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 17/12/2022 $7,444 $8,938 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 27/12/2021 $7,586 $5,539 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/12/2020 $6,079 $2,636 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 28/12/2019 $8,485 $1,964 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2018 $7,403 $2,841 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/12/2017 $6,267 $3,814 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 10/12/2016 $6,645 $4,778 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/11/2015 $5,861 $4,284 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 8/10/2014 $7,862 $4,987 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Saskia Simpson Secretary 18/11/2022
Wiremu Demchick Technician 18/11/2022
Jean Crawford Board Member 10/12/2016
Scott Billington Technician 10/12/2016
Daniel Simpson Chairman & Treasurer 20/11/2015
Neil McDonald Crawford Board Member 1/07/2013
Hugh Frazer Neilson Board Member 27/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emily Anne Speller Communications Co-ordinator 30/09/2023
Genevieve de Vries Secretary 10/06/2022
Jonathan Paul McLean Technician 1/10/2021
Ralph Pond Board Member 19/09/2020
Daffyd Hughes Chairman 13/07/2020
Kevin John McKenna Treasurer 11/03/2016
Glenys Anne Taylor Studio Operator 30/06/2015
Eril Shotton Treasurer and Programme Manager 27/09/2013
Lindsay Keith Shotton Chairman - Program Producer 27/09/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/12/2022 NOC016
13/06/2020 NOC012
11/01/2020 NOC011
9/11/2015 NOC006
17/11/2013 NOC005
2/10/2008 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.