Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Chris Ruth Centre Trust
The Chris Ruth Centre Trust
CC10873
9429043028757
Registered

Registration details

16/08/2007
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Christchurch Supported Employment Centre Trust 17/08/2007
The Chris Ruth Centre Trust 21/08/2008

Address for service

PO Box 9027
Tower Junction
Christchurch
8149
20 Tankerville Road
Hoon Hay
Christchurch
8025

Charity's other details

(03)3392930


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide community participation services to persons over 18 years of age with physical and intellectual complex needs

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services

People with disabilities

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 18/06/2023 $4,749,538 $4,165,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 27/05/2022 $4,580,717 $4,028,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 27/05/2021 $3,891,963 $3,636,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $3,684,699 $3,525,550 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 9/05/2019 $3,531,721 $3,317,351 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 9/07/2018 $3,052,802 $2,855,232 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 27/07/2017 $2,879,071 $2,552,073 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 18/08/2016 $2,495,650 $2,514,959 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 24/06/2015 $2,610,024 $2,313,505 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Stephen Winder Board Member 25/09/2020
Olivia Thompson Board Member 29/03/2019
Marilyn Anne Paston Chief Executive Officer 1/08/2018
Joanne Helen Allan Board Member 23/05/2018
Paul Mcgirr Treasurer 24/08/2011
Judy Eaton Secretary 25/06/2009
Gae Neame Chairperson 14/05/2007
Jacinta Grice Deputy Chairperson 14/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lynda Steele Secretary 26/06/2020
Kevin Tutty Chairperson 1/05/2018
Sally Thomas Board Member 6/05/2014
Margaret Ruth Chairperson 27/05/2012
Judith Gray Board Member 25/05/2011
Christine Varley Board Member 24/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2020 NOC014
12/09/2019 NOC012
8/05/2015 NOC008
30/05/2012 AR006
28/07/2011 AR005
14/06/2010 AR004
5/06/2009 AR002
5/06/2009 NOC003
28/07/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.