Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


He Whānau Manaaki o Tararua Free Kindergarten Association Incorporated
Whānau Manaaki Kindergartens
CC11092
9429042913672
Registered

Registration details

12/09/2007
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Wellington Region Free Kindergarten Association Incorporated 13/09/2007
He Whānau Manaaki o Tararua Free Kindergarten Association Incorporated 6/08/2014

Address for service

PO Box 50743
Porirua City Centre
Porirua
5240
Unit F
15 John Seddon Drive
Porirua
Wellington
5022

Charity's other details

(04) 2323069
(04) 2323096
https://www.facebook.com/whanaumanaakikindergartens


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provision of Early Childhood Services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/02/2024 $71,158,000 $69,201,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 12/02/2023 $65,082,000 $64,791,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 21/12/2021 $60,372,000 $60,619,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/01/2021 $57,650,000 $57,320,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 5/01/2020 $46,086,000 $45,284,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 8/01/2019 $44,740,000 $44,022,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 13/01/2018 $43,858,000 $43,125,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 28/05/2017 $42,494,000 $42,991,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 25/05/2017 $41,446,000 $41,381,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kylie Jennifer Semu Board Member 7/11/2024
Rachel Caroline Graves Board Member 7/11/2024
Anne Prescott Board Member 31/08/2023
Emma Jane McGregor Board Member 31/08/2023
Jessica Wikitoria Firmin Board Member 29/09/2022
Hayley Jean Galo Board Member 20/05/2022
Kathleen Cooper Board Member 26/10/2021
Miranda Frances Zander Board member 22/09/2020
Martin Robinson Board Member 15/10/2019
Amanda Coulston CEO 6/08/2014
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anna Susan Faasolo Board Member 7/11/2024
Ashley Nicole Newson Board Member 7/11/2024
Genia Kohrt Board Member 31/08/2023
Iona To'omaga-Iona Board Member 31/08/2023
Emma McGregor Board Member 28/09/2022
Joanna Young Board Member 28/09/2022
Kyran Smith Board Member 23/09/2021
Monika Ciolek Board Member 23/09/2021
Jane Braun Deputy CEO 27/05/2021
Allanah Clark Board Member 22/09/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/11/2024 NOC032
26/11/2024 NOC031
18/07/2023 NOC029
25/10/2022 NOC026
5/08/2022 NOC025
20/01/2022 NOC024
17/11/2021 NOC022
22/10/2021 NOC021
6/11/2020 NOC019
6/12/2019 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.