pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rigdrol Yeshe Buddhist Institute
Kagyu Choeyang Ling Christchurch
CC11165
9429043148660
Registered

Registration details

19/09/2007
March 31

Address for service

39 Rodney Street
New Brighton
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

029 249 0613


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to: • Promote and support the awareness, understanding, study and practice of Buddhism with a special emphasis on the practice of Buddhism according to the teachings of the Kagyu lineage of Tibetan Buddhism as defined by HH the 17th Gyalwa Karmapa Orgyen Trinley Dorje, his regent and successors; • Provide education to individuals, communities, institutions, corporate and charitable bodies; • Provide health and well-being services and support to individuals, communities, institutions, corporate and charitable bodies; • Promote and provide access to cultural experiences that have their origins in or are related to Buddhism and / or human and societal well-being; and • Carry out any activities consistent with the charitable purpose of the Trust. In carrying out the purposes of the Trust, the Trustees will be guided by the wishes of the Spiritual Director, Venerable Lama Assi, and HH Karmapa.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

General public

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Animals, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Rigdrol Yeshe is a registered charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 28/10/2023 $26,732 $22,926
30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $26,289 $22,521
30/09/2021 10/10/2021 $23,912 $21,957
30/09/2020 5/10/2020 $34,017 $35,121
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $34,108 $29,724
30/09/2018 28/10/2018 $16,826 $17,722
30/09/2017 8/10/2017 $16,797 $18,060
30/09/2016 8/10/2016 $19,642 $18,523
30/09/2015 1/10/2015 $19,884 $19,697
30/09/2014 5/10/2014 $11,371 $11,816

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pemba Lama Trustee 30/09/2012
Rhonda Gail Brownlees Trustee 30/09/2012
Darrell Kilian Trustee 16/06/2009
Wilhelmina Flick Trustee 26/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lea Godfrey Trustee 31/03/2023
Geraldine Watson - 19/08/2012
Vivienne Lama Secretary 1/01/2010
Brendan Lee - 14/06/2009
Sarah Jensen Trustee 14/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2022 NOC017
8/10/2016 NOC009
19/10/2013 AR007
30/09/2012 AR006
26/10/2011 AR005
18/02/2011 NOC003
28/09/2010 AR004
14/10/2009 AR003
14/10/2009 NOC002
10/09/2008 AR002

Charity Documents