Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kohanga Reo National Trust Board
CC11324
9429042863502
Registered

Registration details

10/10/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38741
Wellington Mail Centre
Lower Hutt
5045
67 Hankey Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)3818750
(04)3818777


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To continue to strengthen the growth of the Kohanga movement and the everyday use of Te Reo Māori including whanau learning and development.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

Family / whanau

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Te Pataka Ohanga Limited CC20442

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 26/06/2024 $19,478,000 $17,897,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/11/2023 22/11/2023 $16,602,000 $15,449,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 12/06/2022 $14,910,000 $15,470,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 1/06/2021 $15,586,000 $14,939,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 20/07/2020 $12,211,000 $11,580,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 21/05/2019 $9,990,000 $10,510,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 18/06/2018 $10,532,000 $9,765,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/05/2017 $10,191,000 $8,951,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 13/06/2016 $9,368,000 $8,765,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Te Rire Trustee 17/08/2022
Andrew Barry Reiper Trustee 27/06/2022
Eugene Christopher Cassidy Trustee 27/06/2022
Tom Anthony Alesana Trustee 27/06/2022
Hoana McMillian Trustee 27/04/2021
Peggy Wahataua Luke-Ngaheke Trustee 27/04/2021
Angus Hemi Hartley CEO 16/01/2019
Hurimoana Dennis Trustee 26/06/2017
Matuakore Hook Trustee 26/06/2017
Tewheoro Rangikotua Trustee 26/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Lillian Tipene Trustee 22/04/2023
Tariana Turia Trustee 22/04/2023
Waihoroi Paraone Hoterene Trustee 22/04/2023
Andrew Barry Rieper Trustee 27/06/2022
Drusilla Kapu Barrett Trustee 12/12/2017
Timoti Samual Karetu Trustee 12/12/2017
Tina Olsen-Ratana Trustee 12/12/2017
Iritana Te Rangi Tawhiwhirangi Trustee 27/06/2017
James Te Wharehuia Milroy Trustee 27/06/2017
Manuera Tohu Trustee 22/05/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/06/2024 NOC035
17/06/2024 NOC034
17/04/2024 NOC033
27/09/2023 NOC030
1/08/2023 NOC028
14/01/2021 NOC025
17/03/2020 NOC023
11/09/2019 NOC022
1/02/2018 NOC019
1/02/2018 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.