Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kidney Health New Zealand Incorporated
CC11348
9429042748090
Registered

Registration details

14/10/2007
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
New Zealand Kidney Foundation 15/10/2007
Kidney Health New Zealand Incorporated 31/01/2008

Address for service

PO Box 20072
Bishopdale
Christchurch
8543
6F Sir William Pickering Drive
337 Harewood Road
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

021 663 466
www.facebook.com/Kidney-Health-New-Zealand-206096806091572/
https://twitter.com/kidneyhealthnz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A. National Services –to establish long-term sustainable national services that are fully funded, efficient, impactful and aligned to the needs of the kidney community. B. Collective Patient Support – to co-design shared support services and create single sources of kidney health resources to help those with kidney disease know who to contact and where to look for support materials, and how to navigate the NZ system. C. Raise Awareness – to raise community and healthcare professional awareness and understanding of CKD to support prevention, early detection and self-management targeted at priority communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 26/09/2024 $432,863 $775,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $442,452 $1,015,987 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 3/11/2022 $712,323 $723,114 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 8/09/2021 $232,605 $554,716 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $420,891 $401,867 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 11/10/2019 $227,635 $425,421 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 10/10/2018 $271,619 $418,976 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/11/2017 $521,707 $510,882 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 4/10/2016 $476,002 $555,292 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Curtis Walker Board member 20/06/2024
Maree Munro Board member 26/10/2023
Rachael Walker Board member 26/10/2023
Andrew David Baker Chief Executive Officer 3/07/2023
David Shearer Board Member 7/11/2018
John Kearns Board Member 7/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mara Angela Fisher Board member 19/09/2024
Jo-Anne Marie Denvir Board member 20/06/2024
Christine Prince Board Memeber 26/10/2023
Traci Stanbury Acting General Manager 30/06/2023
Fale Andrew Lesa Board Member 27/10/2022
Michael Kevin Campbell General Manager 17/06/2022
Nicholas Raymond Polaschek Board Member 14/10/2021
Michael Papesch Board Member 26/11/2020
Natalie Brown Treasurer 26/11/2020
Richard Robson Treasurer 28/10/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2024 NOC039
2/10/2024 NOC038
6/12/2023 NOC036
29/11/2023 NOC035
29/11/2023 NOC034
29/11/2023 NOC033
6/09/2023 NOC031
20/09/2022 NOC029
22/08/2022 NOC028
10/06/2022 NOC027
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.