Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christchurch Symphony Trust
Christchurch Symphony Orchestra, CSO
CC11437
9429043142316
Registered

Registration details

25/10/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 3260
Christchurch
8140
CSO Centre, Christchurch Town Hall
86 Kilmore Street
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

(03)943 7797
@ChristchurchSymphonyOrchestra
@chchsymphony
www.instagram.com/christchurchsymphonyorchestra/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a wide range of ways in which the communities we serve can discover, encounter and enjoy great musical experiences; and that we grow those communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides musical services through concerts, community engagement, and educational activities)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 20/06/2023 $3,020,864 $3,360,206 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 12/06/2022 $2,990,657 $3,045,542 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $4,086,873 $2,659,658 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2020 $3,012,018 $3,070,587 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 29/05/2019 $3,406,253 $2,731,237 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 17/07/2018 $2,545,344 $2,636,336 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 7/07/2017 $2,544,110 $2,695,306 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 4/07/2016 $2,706,901 $2,669,299 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 30/04/2015 $2,794,682 $2,644,476 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 27/07/2014 $2,460,277 $2,450,942 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben O'Grady Trustee 15/08/2023
Julia Maria Paola Innocente-Jones Trustee 11/07/2022
Mads Moller Trustee 11/07/2022
Renee Walker Trustee 27/10/2020
Claire Evans Trustee 28/08/2018
Steve Clarke Chair 28/02/2017
James Baines Trustee 24/02/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vanessa Doig Trustee 9/09/2023
Kathy Meads Trustee 15/08/2023
Bruce Robertson Irvine Member 13/03/2021
Therese Arseneau Trustee 13/03/2021
William James Luff Trustee 27/10/2020
Peter Van Keulen Trustee 31/07/2018
Margot Christeller Trustee 27/03/2018
Pauline Mary Scanlan Deputy Chair 26/04/2016
Anthony Cuthbert Hughes-Johnson Member 31/12/2014
Richard Ballantyne Trustee 31/12/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/06/2024 NOC024
1/02/2024 NOC023
11/12/2023 NOC022
19/06/2023 NOC019
18/02/2020 NOC015
7/09/2016 NOC011
4/07/2016 NOC010
15/04/2015 NOC009
16/10/2014 NOC008
11/11/2013 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.