pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


He Korowai Trust
CC20099
9429043060009
Registered

Registration details

22/11/2007
June 30

Address for service

P.O. Box
401
Kaitaia
Northland
0441
25 Commerce Street
Kaitaia 0410
Kaitaia
0410

Charity's other details

(09)4084844


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our work advocates for social and economic fairness for all people. We achieve this by using Te Tiriti O Waitangi, including human rights principals to advance, endorse, promote and provide any service or scheme that trustees believe will improve the social, cultural, economic, educational, vocational and spiritual needs of all people, across all primary life domains Housing, Health, Justice, Training and Employment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provide free services which any person may access across all primary life domains Health, Housing, Education, Justice, Employment, Training

Other (please state)

(Community / Economic development, Social justice, Housing, Emergency housing, Youth Services, Family care, Parenting, Mentoring, Coaching)

Other (please state)

(Low income including any person who has been refused help or falls outside all government or Iwi service provision)

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2013 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 16/03/2022 $2,760,398 $2,216,609
31/12/2020 30/10/2020 $3,414,528 $2,270,605
31/12/2019 19/01/2020 $3,124,329 $2,288,288
31/12/2018 26/02/2019 $2,216,749 $1,434,819
31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $904,563 $806,129
31/12/2016 16/12/2016 $3,550,137 $1,247,892
31/12/2015 15/11/2015 $666,539 $595,466
31/12/2014 24/03/2015 $816,508 $591,872
31/12/2013 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Beverly Hall Trustee 4/09/2019
Waitai Ratima Petera Trustee 18/06/2018
June Te Aroha Taylor Trustee 18/05/2018
Val Taylor Trustee 18/05/2018
Godfrey James Rudolph Trustee 18/10/2017
Trudy Janice Brown Trustee 18/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Beverley Moana Hall-Smith Kaumatua Komiti 4/09/2019
Margaret Beverly Stratton Secretary 28/02/2019
Murray Lay Chairman 21/02/2019
Gillian Anne Shepherd Treasurer 1/05/2018
Waimaria Lesley Veza Trustee 1/05/2018
Naida Glavish Chairperson 18/10/2017
Shane Jones Trustee 18/10/2017
Ricky Martin Houghton Trustee/Chief Executive 30/06/2017
Sophie Anne Smith Trustee 30/06/2017
Rayna Ann Tuhimata Trustee 12/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/11/2020 NOC025
31/10/2019 NOC021
28/09/2019 NOC020
2/04/2019 NOC018
5/06/2018 NOC016
5/06/2018 NOC015
2/08/2017 NOC013
19/03/2017 NOC010
19/03/2017 NOC009
21/12/2016 NOC008

Charity Documents