Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Diabetes NZ Horowhenua Incorporated
CC20192
9429043056651
Deregistered
31/01/2013
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another charitable entity.

Below are details of Diabetes NZ Horowhenua Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

5/12/2007
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/01/2013 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another charitable entity.
Registered 5/12/2007

Address for service

C/-
41 Princes Street
Levin
5510
C/- 41 Princes Street
Levin
5510

Charity's other details

(06)3688740
(06)3688740


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 7/08/2012 $11,024 $9,946 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 15/05/2011 $19,195 $18,504 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 30/07/2010 $20,699 $27,062 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2008 30/06/2009 23/05/2009 $19,515 $11,598 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jeremy Ellen Committee Member 28/03/2011
Jan Duggan Committee Member 28/04/2010
Micheal Pinhey Committee Member 28/04/2010
Christine Lange 25/03/09 6/12/2007
Christine Warren Committee Member/Treasurer 6/12/2007
Fiona-Ann Wright Committee member 6/12/2007
George Robert Wright Vice President 6/12/2007
John Mullany Committee Member 6/12/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Patricia Cannon Committee Member 28/03/2011
Michael Allsopp Committee Member 31/12/2010
Jeffrey-george Martin Committee Member 28/04/2010
Julie Breden Committee Member 28/04/2010
Malcolm Thorpe Committee Member 28/04/2010
Daniel Duggan Secretary 25/03/2009
Frederick Healey Committee Member 25/03/2009
Kenneth Brown Committee Member 25/03/2009
Rex Mai President 25/03/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/08/2012 AR005
15/05/2011 AR004
30/07/2010 AR003
23/05/2009 AR002
25/01/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.