pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Youth Alive Trust
CC20229
9429042921820
Registered

Registration details

11/12/2007
December 31

Address for service

111 Seaview Road
New Brighton
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

(03)3881001


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Purpose is building bright futures for young people on the east of Christchurch through practical Christian Service.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Other (please state)

(Youth Activities), Education / training / research, Social services, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Our Governance body is a Board of trustees which meets every 6 weeks. There are 16 Staff (12.26 FTE) and 10 Contractors. Two share the Trust Management who oversees all service operations and report directly to the Board of Trustees. There are approximately 52 weekly volunteers, who, with employees, have specific responsibilities and lines of accountability. Regular reporting to Stake holders is undertaken.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 19/11/2023 $984,271 $1,166,251
30/06/2022 31/10/2022 $1,080,451 $1,295,649
30/06/2021 10/12/2021 $1,305,470 $1,246,702
31/08/2020 24/11/2020 $948,217 $1,019,316
30/06/2019 3/04/2020 $1,376,142 $670,274
30/06/2018 29/10/2019 $503,387 $558,473
30/06/2017 26/09/2017 $526,030 $484,505
30/06/2016 6/06/2016 $410,641 $432,757
30/06/2015 29/08/2015 $404,288 $399,072
30/06/2014 29/07/2014 $314,516 $464,231

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Katherine Anne Tarr Trustee 18/05/2022
Matthew John Barlow Trustee 18/05/2022
Nathan Gregory Irvine Trustee 18/05/2022
Clark Robert Alcock Trustee 23/03/2020
Anthony Craig Walter Trustee 23/08/2016
Deborah Swaney Trustee 16/04/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Scott Pickering Trustee 30/10/2022
Andrew Wilbur Alfred Hill Trustee 21/09/2022
Linda Hampton Trustee 31/12/2020
James A Renwick Trustee 30/10/2019
Stan Tawa Trustee 4/10/2017
Rick Mardon Trustee 23/08/2016
John Gerard Grant Trustee 12/11/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/04/2020 NOC013
24/05/2019 NOC011
6/05/2017 NOC009
29/07/2014 NOC008
11/06/2013 AR007
28/06/2012 AR006
5/07/2011 AR004
17/08/2009 AR002
16/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents