pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lam Charitable Trust
NZ LAM Charitable Trust
CC20304
9429042978756
Registered

Registration details

19/12/2007
June 30

Address for service

8 Paget Street
Freemans Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

09 376 4936


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Raise Funds to Support Scientific Research into LAM Support patients Educate Medical and Lay Communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Fundraising for scientific research/women who suffer from rare lung disease: support

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Women who suffer from rare Lung Disease)

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust Non Profit Organisation Voluntary Trustees . oluntary

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 9/01/2023 $276 $574
31/12/2021 22/02/2022 $613 $18,051
31/12/2020 13/12/2020 $14,720 $21,936
31/12/2019 9/10/2019 $46,064 $37,653
31/12/2018 14/12/2018 $24,623 $26,108
31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $10,113 $0
31/12/2016 12/01/2017 $14,530 $33,506
31/12/2015 26/11/2015 $39,644 $57,684
31/12/2014 9/03/2015 $8,277 $3,547
31/12/2013 10/01/2014 $10,289 $30,439

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jill Nancy Pierce Trustee 9/10/2017
Lesley Ann Aldridge Trustee 10/10/2016
Janet Anne Barrett Trustee 13/10/2008
Bronwyn Gray Chairperson 7/08/2007
Christine Forster Trustee 7/08/2007
Dr Hetty Rodenburg Trustee 7/08/2007
Jennifer Shieff Trustee 7/08/2007
John Gianoutsos Treasurer 7/08/2007
Sandrine Anderson Trustee 7/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wally Hirsh Trustee 4/11/2019
Dinah Morrison Trustee 11/11/2013
Carol Hirschfield Trustee 4/11/2013
Adina Halpern Trustee 13/10/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/01/2014 NOC006
26/03/2012 AR005
5/01/2011 AR004
7/01/2010 AR003
5/01/2009 AR002

Charity Documents