pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Philanthropy New Zealand
New Zealand Association of Philanthropic Trusts
CC20346
9429042781486
Registered

Registration details

2/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1521
Wellington
6140
Level 2
50 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 499 4090


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Purpose - Growing Effective Giving We do this through: - Supporting better giving - Inspiring more giving - Building a stronger sector

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Other (please state)

(Philanthropic Sector umbrella organisation)

Other charities

Grantmaking organisations - including Trusts and Foundations

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 12/10/2022 $1,153,431 $897,781
31/12/2021 22/12/2021 $903,034 $863,752
31/12/2020 8/12/2020 $687,505 $696,906
31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $986,716 $930,785
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $552,105 $608,351
31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $937,007 $767,913
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $535,417 $650,096
31/12/2015 3/12/2015 $795,744 $598,489
31/12/2014 3/02/2015 $416,492 $552,284

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rahul Watson Govindan Chief Executive 16/10/2023
Leighton Evans Board Member 30/03/2023
Leonie Matoe Board Member 30/03/2023
Rose Challies Board Member 1/12/2022
Te Āti Awa Board Member 1/12/2022
Tupe Solomon-Tanoa'i Deputy Chair 3/12/2020
Jeremy Faumuina Board Member 10/09/2020
Gemma Major Board Member 19/12/2019
Seumas Michael Fantham Chairperson 6/12/2018
Terri Eggleton Board Member 21/12/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ken Whitney Chairperson 1/12/2022
Leighton Evans Board Member 1/12/2022
Whetu Campbell Board Member 1/12/2022
Annette Culpan Board Member 29/04/2022
Leighton Evans Board Member 2/12/2021
Murray Jones Board Member 28/03/2020
Barry Baker Board Member 5/12/2019
Rongo Kirkwood Board Member 5/12/2019
Sandra Kai Fong Board Member 23/05/2019
Jennifer Walsh Board Member 24/01/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/10/2023 NOC037
11/04/2023 NOC036
3/02/2023 NOC035
16/12/2022 NOC033
16/12/2022 NOC032
11/11/2022 NOC031
9/09/2022 NOC029
3/06/2022 NOC028
2/06/2022 NOC027
8/09/2020 NOC023

Charity Documents