Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Mental Health Advocacy and Peer Support Trust
MHAPS
CC20499
9429042810520
Deregistered
17/01/2025

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Mental Health Advocacy and Peer Support Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

14/01/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 17/01/2025 The charity is merging or has merged with another registered charity
Registered 14/01/2008

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Psychiatric Consumers Trust 15/01/2008
Mental Health Advocacy and Peer Support Trust 1/07/2011

Address for service

PO Box 21020
Edgeware
St Albans
Christchurch
8143
Unit 4
357 Madras Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

(03)365 9479
https://www.facebook.com/mhapschch/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary purpose of the Trust is to facilitate and promote self-determination, recovery and well-being by working alongside people affected by mental distress, difference and/or addictions distress through peer-led and peer-provided services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Social services, People with disabilities

General public

People experiencing mental health challenges or mental distress in any form, including because of difference or addiction.

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/07/08 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/07/09.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/12/2024 $1,326,385 $1,042,054 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 29/02/2024 29/02/2024 $1,302,019 $1,108,528 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 28/02/2023 1/03/2023 $1,290,523 $1,153,496 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/01/2022 3/02/2022 $1,177,454 $1,056,589 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 2/12/2020 $1,239,261 $1,109,955 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 15/12/2019 $1,258,369 $1,183,747 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $1,267,832 $1,124,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 29/10/2017 $1,160,460 $1,043,269 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 25/11/2016 $1,049,298 $1,048,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 29/10/2015 $999,053 $1,026,498 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Margarett Clarke Trustee 25/07/2023
Steve Penny Trustee 25/07/2023
Clare Mary Pitt Office Manager 27/02/2023
Jacqueline Simons Chairperson 9/03/2021
Raewyn Joy Svarnas Trustee 13/05/2020
Maree Joanne Kenyon Treasurer 15/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Clothier Trustee 28/07/2023
Kaitlyn Tahlia White Trustee 5/07/2023
Effie Lokeni Deputy Chairperson 31/03/2023
Angela Rippon Trustee 13/12/2022
Nicola Wood Chairperson 13/12/2022
Marie Joanne Kenyon Treasurer 17/05/2021
Rae Svarnas Trustee 17/05/2021
Maree Joanne Bartrum Treasurer 10/05/2021
Kirsty Osprey To be removed 16/12/2020
Maree Yates Treasurer 1/04/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/08/2023 NOC048
23/08/2023 NOC047
23/08/2023 NOC046
23/08/2023 NOC045
12/05/2023 NOC043
5/04/2023 NOC042
4/04/2023 NOC041
20/01/2023 NOC039
20/01/2023 NOC038
10/08/2022 NOC036
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.