Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust
CC20582
9429042829942
Registered

Registration details

21/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 718
Hastings
4156
821 Orchard Road
Camberley
Hastings
4120

Charity's other details

(06)8715350
(06)8715351


Group Members


Below are all the members of . Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust
Waingākau Housing Development

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mauri ora ki te mana Māori o Heretaunga: To uplift the well-being of Heretaunga Māori

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are a community mandated organisation governed by a board of 15 trustees. Each trustee is a representative of the Marae that reside in the Heretaunga area. We provide a range of services in health, social, education and community development.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Waingākau Housing Development CC58007

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 19/12/2023 $57,966,651 $49,833,615 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 24/11/2022 $51,594,437 $42,866,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 23/12/2021 $36,723,267 $31,142,706 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $28,072,654 $26,736,747 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $24,310,531 $23,915,575 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $20,521,735 $20,079,140 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 29/11/2017 $14,771,404 $14,534,377 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $14,001,658 $14,067,934 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 26/11/2015 $13,874,054 $13,916,462 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 4/12/2014 $12,919,596 $13,089,816 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Moira McGarva-Ratapu Trustee 28/05/2022
Annette Harris Trustee 3/02/2022
Aretha Edwards Trustee 3/02/2022
Kane Koko Trustee 3/02/2022
Paula Savae Trustee 3/02/2022
Thompson Hokianga Trustee 3/02/2022
Waylyn June Tahuri-Whaipakanga Chief Executive Officer 24/05/2021
Heeni Carlson Trustee 5/03/2020
Monica Kendrick Trustee 7/02/2019
Ripeka Kireka Trustee 7/02/2019
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bayden Barber Trustee 28/05/2022
Aberielle Robin Trustee 3/02/2022
Bridget Joanne Paku Trustee 3/02/2022
Christine Hilton Trustee 3/02/2022
Horiana Williams Trustee 3/02/2022
Waiora Rogers Trustee 3/02/2022
George Haig Reedy Chief Executive 7/05/2021
Turori Whetu-Rangi Chapman Trustee 10/01/2020
Aretha Edwards Trustee 25/01/2019
Alayna Ann Watene Trustee 1/01/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2022 NOC040
27/05/2022 NOC039
11/02/2022 NOC038
8/02/2022 NOC037
13/10/2020 NOC034
3/05/2019 NOC030
22/02/2019 NOC029
15/12/2017 NOC027
4/09/2017 NOC025
7/03/2016 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.