Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Atamira Dance Collective Charitable Trust
Atamira Dance Company
CC20585
9429043177967
Registered

Registration details

22/01/2008
December 31

Address for service

Atamira Dance Company - Corbans Estate Arts Centre
2 Mt Lebanon Lane
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

0212621288
https://www.facebook.com/atamiradance
https://www.instagram.com/atamiradancecompany/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster, promote and develop Māori Contemporary Dance by providing a platform for Māori choreographers and dancers to create, develop, teach and present work and to assist those choreographers and dancers to achieve those objectives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Māori Contemporary Dance )

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Sport / recreation

General public

Māori Dancers and Artists

Entity Structure

Atamira Dance Collective Charitable Trust has its office at 2 Mt Lebanon lane at the Corban Arts Estate in Waitakere City, Auckland. The Trust employs 2 full time directors - Executive and Artistic, to deliver the annual artistic programme and purpose of the Trust, and up to 4 part time office staff in production, finance, marketing and education roles. We contract artists for projects and outsource marketing and branding contracts.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 27/06/2023 $683,543 $821,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 27/06/2022 $570,101 $598,659 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 7/09/2021 $801,464 $567,239 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 7/09/2020 $405,895 $454,254 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 1/08/2019 $534,379 $524,598 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 13/07/2018 $518,775 $510,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 15/03/2018 $657,713 $650,207 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 15/03/2018 $507,323 $514,497 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 19/09/2016 $421,643 $442,518 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 19/09/2016 $606,507 $530,565 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between 1 April 2021- 31 December 2021 (9months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Natasha Pearce Trustee 19/01/2023
Mereana Kyllikki Beconcini trustee 12/10/2022
Suzanne Watt Finance Executive 13/04/2020
Tracey Lloydd Executive Director 25/06/2018
Hayley Puawai Cairns Trustee 1/11/2015
Dolina Wehipeihana trustee 23/08/2010
Peter Moana Nepia Trustee 23/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jackie Brooking Junior Gray Artistic Director 7/07/2023
Paul McLaney Trustee 10/05/2022
Wendy Preston Trustee 1/09/2021
Callan Taylor Chartered Accountant 31/03/2021
Puawai Cairns Trustee 1/12/2019
Bryan Patterson Executive Director 1/07/2019
Shaista Shameem Trustee 1/12/2015
Lara Bowen Trustee 1/12/2013
Jackie Brooking Jnr Gray Trustee 31/12/2011
Mark Joseph Wiki Pepene Trustee 23/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2023 NOC025
29/11/2022 NOC023
3/02/2022 NOC021
3/02/2022 NOC020
10/03/2021 NOC018
6/12/2019 NOC016
6/12/2019 NOC015
2/12/2019 NOC014
29/11/2019 NOC013
13/07/2018 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.