Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Buddhist Centre (Triratna Buddhist Community)
Auckland Buddhist Centre
CC20695
9429042704232
Registered

Registration details

27/01/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Friends Of The Western Buddhist Order - Auckland Buddhist Centre 28/01/2008
Auckland Buddhist Centre (Triratna Buddhist Community) 30/05/2010

Address for service

45B Normanby Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

+64 27 223 0382
https://www.facebook.com/AkldBuddhistCentre/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Triratna Buddhist Order was founded by the Venerable Sangharakshita in an attempt to translate the traditional teachings of the Buddha into a language and format more relevant for contemporary living. We endeavour to make it available and accessible to all who seek its wisdom. The purpose of the Auckland Buddhist Centre, which is part of the wider international community known as the Triratna Buddhist Community, is the advancement of the Buddhist religion in New Zealand as understood and practised within the Triratna Buddhist Order. In particular: • To encourage members and others to live in accordance with the teachings of the Buddha. • To support ordained members of' the Triratna Buddhist Order, and other duly ordained Buddhists, at the discretion of the Council of the Auckland Buddhist Centre. • To maintain close communication with and work under the guidance of the Triratna Buddhist Order and in co-operation with other groups known as the Triratna Buddhist Community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Auckland Buddhist Centre (Triratna Buddhist Community) is governed by a council of elected officers including a chairperson. These council members are also members of the Triratna Buddhist Order or those training for ordination within that Order. The council employs a part-time Centre Manager for up to 30 hours per week and supports one Triratna Order member with a stipend.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/12/2023 $2,431,413 $250,688 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 30/03/2023 $174,496 $153,031 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 28/02/2022 22/02/2022 $207,470 $201,687 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 26/11/2020 $153,906 $140,520 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $162,865 $157,471 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 29/11/2018 $171,722 $152,708 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 14/12/2017 $121,601 $123,638 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 14/12/2016 $124,252 $132,930 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $157,133 $147,980 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 19/12/2014 $137,669 $139,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Malcolm Dow Council member 2/12/2023
Helen Ann Clack Council Member 29/11/2022
Maree Beverland Chairperson 27/11/2018
Helen Julia Roach Council member 19/07/2018
Erica Law Council member 8/11/2016
James Julius Neidhart Council member 1/11/2011
Rohit Vig Council member 1/11/2011
Steve Kurman Council Member 22/11/2010
Averil Hunt Council Member 6/11/2009
Elizabeth Jean Smith Council Member 30/09/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Natalie Grace Council member 23/11/2021
Karenza Fullerton Council member 30/01/2018
Anne Rosamund Dodkin Council Member 8/11/2016
Brian Anthony Moreton Council Member 2/11/2015
Anne Macgregor committee member 30/11/2014
Clare Margaret Feeney Trustee & Council Member 1/11/2011
Diane May Committee member 1/11/2011
Helen Commander Committee Member 1/11/2011
Helen Commander committee member 1/11/2011
Peter Lumsden Trustee & Council Member 24/05/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/02/2022 NOC018
19/07/2018 NOC013
16/11/2015 NOC010
19/12/2014 NOC009
18/12/2012 AR005
13/12/2011 AR004
13/12/2011 NOC005
15/12/2010 AR003
29/07/2010 NOC004
23/12/2009 AR002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.