Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Beyond Imagination Trust
Curate Church
CC20889
9429043065707
Registered

Registration details

1/02/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4480
Mount Maunganui South
Mount Maunganui
3149
42C Tawa Street
Mount Maunganui 3116
Mount Maunganui
3116

Charity's other details

(07) 572 0998


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To maintain, promote and support the work of Curate Church.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Beyond Imagination Publishing Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Curate Music Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 31/10/2024 21/10/2024 $3,165,672 $3,868,172 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/09/2023 $4,576,577 $4,130,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/08/2022 $5,786,710 $4,155,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/09/2021 $4,893,629 $3,763,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/10/2024 9/09/2020 $5,001,211 $3,659,410 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 28/02/2020 3/03/2020 $3,693,274 $2,422,180 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 31/12/2018 23/12/2018 $3,029,082 $2,804,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $2,017,538 $1,788,620 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $1,932,014 $1,437,547 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nickesh Kishor Khiroya Trustee 14/10/2024
Sarah Jane Khiroya Trustee 14/10/2024
Matt Collier Trustee 18/04/2024
Murray McBride Trustee 18/04/2024
Marco Buitendag Trustee 17/04/2024
Ngaire Scott Trustee 17/04/2024
Rohan McCloskey Trustee 15/04/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrea Johnson Trustee 10/08/2024
Joel David Milgate Trustee 23/04/2024
John Miller Trustee 31/03/2024
Joshua Fong Trustee 31/03/2024
Beks Anderson Trustee 13/03/2024
Stefan Greenway Trustee 11/05/2023
Katie Monique Milgate Trustee 1/11/2022
Zane Murray George Trustee 17/08/2022
Murray McBride Trustee 25/05/2021
Ngaire Scott Trustee 17/11/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/12/2024 NOC035
12/08/2024 NOC033
11/06/2024 NOC032
29/08/2023 NOC030
8/11/2022 NOC028
28/10/2022 NOC027
8/02/2022 NOC024
23/09/2021 NOC023
27/08/2021 NOC021
16/12/2020 NOC020
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.