Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Branch Foundation
The Branch Foundation
CC20996
9429043175536
Registered

Registration details

7/02/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Opportunity for Poor Children New Zealand 8/02/2008
The Branch Foundation 1/12/2008

Address for service

2 Kauri Point Road
Laingholm
Auckland
604

Charity's other details

+ 64 (0) 210424910
https://www.facebook.com/The-Branch-Foundation-48885609241/?fref=ts
https://twitter.com/BranchFound

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Branch Foundation aims to work alongside marginalized communities in Southeast Asia to support sustainable community development through education, capacity building and renewable energy solutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 21/09/2023 $19,100 $2,051 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 6/09/2022 $10,061 $14,211 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $12,567 $12,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 18/09/2020 $16,934 $18,852 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 11/09/2019 $11,868 $20,631 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 29/08/2018 $17,906 $33,838 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 9/08/2017 $59,559 $25,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 8/08/2016 $22,559 $31,292 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 3/06/2015 $44,620 $39,700 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 2/07/2014 $41,502 $32,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tom Edward Rosen Trustee 23/07/2016
Brigitte Martha Lorenz Trustee 17/05/2009
Annabel Harrison Trustee 8/02/2008
Iona Karuna Dolma Proebst Co-ordinator 8/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Glen Williams Accountant 16/08/2017
Jesse Chalmers Trustee 1/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2017 NOC016
3/06/2015 NOC013
8/10/2013 NOC008
13/06/2013 AR006
8/05/2012 AR005
6/05/2011 AR004
21/05/2010 NOC007
12/04/2010 AR003
22/05/2009 AR002
13/05/2009 NOC006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.