Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bluff Seafarers' Centre Incorporated
Sailors Society BLUFF, Bluff Seafarers Centre
CC21190
9429042598312
Registered

Registration details

16/02/2008
March 31

Address for service

46 Lagan Street
Bluff
9814
251 Foreshore Road
Island Harbour 9814
Island Harbour
9814

Charity's other details

032128228


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

provide facilities and services for the welfare of seafarers in the port of Bluff

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Seafarers visiting New Zealand)

Entity Structure

committee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 5/09/2024 $396 $801 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 16/09/2023 $238 $1,183 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 5/09/2022 $236 $600 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/09/2021 $6,625 $4,163 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 14/08/2020 $3,331 $2,930 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/08/2019 $2,999 $1,834 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 17/09/2018 $3,615 $2,740 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $456 $4,678 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 2/10/2016 $3,658 $2,192 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Larry Robbins committee 1/01/2016
Brenda Donovan Vice President 17/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sharon Malofie Executive Committee 1/01/2020
Margaret Jessie Kent Secretary/Treasurer 1/08/2015
Peter William Kent President 1/01/2015
Adrian Hart Executive Committee 5/09/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/08/2015 NOC004
19/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.