Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Tauranga Budget Advisory Service Incorporated
Bay Financial Mentors - Tau Awhi Noa
CC21531
9429042862079
Deregistered
30/06/2024
Other

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Tauranga Budget Advisory Service Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

3/03/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/06/2024 A charitable trust with the same purpose has been established and all assets and contracts transferred to it.
Registered 3/03/2008

Address for service

PO Box 15132
Tauranga
3144
Historic Village
17th Avenue West
Tauranga
3112

Charity's other details

(07)5780969
www.facebook.com/TgaBudgetService


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our trained Team of Financial Mentors builds on the strengths and skills of our clients to enable them to develop their financial capability

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Governance Committee: Our constitution states that the Officers of the service Chair, Vice Chair and Treasurer, together with up to six other Committee Members. Operational structure: Our operations are managed by paid staff and supported by a small number of volunteers. We employ a General Manager, Financial Mentors, administrator, operations and marketing support.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 30/10/2023 $970,687 $737,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 27/10/2022 $910,752 $639,611 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 1/11/2021 $869,802 $614,083 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 29/10/2020 $506,365 $450,629 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 29/10/2019 $410,652 $404,610 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 25/10/2018 $411,881 $400,642 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 28/11/2017 $392,223 $322,045 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/11/2016 $260,671 $241,044 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 18/11/2015 $238,260 $212,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mathew Carl Brown Committee Member 18/07/2022
Maira Carmela Wilson (Walding) Treasurer 24/02/2022
Anthony Steven Craig Robertson Committee Member 22/10/2020
Jessica Barton Plumpton Committee Member 22/10/2020
Julie Barton Foxley Committee Member 22/10/2020
Shirley Gail McCombe Manager 25/03/2019
Cathy Jean Brown Vice Chair 27/10/2016
Terese Marie James Chair 27/10/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Graham Beswick Committee Member and Treasurer 28/10/2021
Ryan Gary Henderson Secretary 15/07/2021
Rachel Pinn President 22/10/2020
Jason Edgecombe Committee Member 17/03/2020
Reweti TeMete Committee Member 17/03/2020
Bari Tamihana Committee Member 20/02/2020
Michelle Harrison Treasurer 24/10/2019
Tam McDonald Committee Member 24/10/2019
Hilary Cutfield Committee member 1/06/2019
Sheldon Nesdale Committee member 1/06/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/10/2022 NOC025
18/01/2022 NOC024
15/12/2021 NOC023
9/12/2021 NOC022
5/10/2020 NOC019
5/11/2019 NOC018
30/10/2019 NOC017
20/06/2019 NOC015
22/04/2016 NOC011
20/04/2016 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.