Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Geyser Community Foundation
Geyser Community Foundation
CC21560
9429043173105
Registered

Registration details

4/03/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Geyser Community Foundation 5/03/2008
Geyser Community Foundation 21/06/2012

Address for service

1274 Eruera Street
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

07 349 7496
www.facebook.com/geysercommunityfoundation


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Community Foundations provide a smarter way to give to the community your love. We can invest and grow your donations so the interest they earn can benefit your chosen local causes year on year, forever.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Community Organisations

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Our core team represents fewer than two full-time equivalent staff. They are supported by a network of committed volunteers including an active Board of up to 12 Trustees, a growing number of Ambassadors and Community Representatives who provide local expertise on various Committees. Trustees are appointed. The Board shall consist of no fewer than seven, no more than 12 Trustees at any one time.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 21/09/2023 $1,069,749 $914,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 31/08/2022 $327,442 $649,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/08/2021 $3,021,840 $329,796 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 25/02/2021 $204,949 $194,992 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 28/08/2019 $383,940 $378,162 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $376,827 $407,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $399,680 $395,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/10/2016 $146,094 $146,094 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 14/09/2015 $317,692 $137,145 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sandra Elizabeth Redpath-Baird Trustee 1/05/2024
Michelle Barnett Trustee 1/04/2024
Paul James Laing Trustee 1/02/2023
Alison Patricia Painter Trustee 31/08/2022
Michael Ray Grantham Trustee 1/04/2022
Janice Margaret Bolton Trustee 11/02/2021
Alan Bryan Wills Trustee 5/10/2020
Donald Bruce Stewart Trustee 22/05/2019
Ann Lloyd Nicholas Trustee 13/07/2018
Marie Helene Phillips Trustee 1/02/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mary-Robyn Clement Trustee 18/08/2023
Christopher Newton Spargo Trustee 20/08/2022
Kierin John Irvine Trustee 18/10/2021
Jennifer Shirley Mayer Trustee 16/02/2021
Ryan Joseph Ashworth Holmes Trustee 10/11/2020
Fraser Grant McKenzie Trustee 18/10/2020
Thomas Peter Davies Trustee 13/03/2020
Patrick Joseph Brown Trustee 17/09/2019
Jeannette Violet Marie Bright Past Trustee 10/05/2019
Murray Lloyd Patchell Past Trustee 10/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/06/2024 NOC052
8/05/2024 NOC051
9/02/2023 NOC048
20/12/2022 NOC046
31/08/2022 NOC044
24/08/2022 NOC043
19/04/2022 NOC042
14/04/2022 NOC041
22/03/2022 NOC040
25/02/2021 NOC038
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.