pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Titirangi Soldiers' Memorial Church
CC21696
9429042879022
Registered

Registration details

10/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

6 Janet Place
Laingholm
Auckland
0604
116 Park Road
Titirangi
Auckland
604

Charity's other details

0224503192
Facebook icon image
0
Twitter icon image
0


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides religious services/activities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Board of 8 Trustees Chairman Secretary Treasurer

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2022 29/08/2022 $3,064 $2,560
31/08/2021 22/09/2021 $2,932 $2,991
31/08/2020 21/09/2020 $4,377 $2,733
30/06/2019 24/06/2019 $4,386 $11,971
30/06/2018 6/06/2018 $4,803 $5,537
30/06/2017 16/08/2017 $4,781 $5,921
30/06/2016 8/06/2016 $4,854 $3,373
30/06/2015 11/06/2015 $4,758 $3,735
30/06/2014 13/06/2014 $5,111 $3,177
30/06/2013 5/06/2013 $6,705 $4,985

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shirley Lynette Anton trustee 12/06/2021
Donald Mark Anton Trustee 15/02/2021
Beryl Ann Sweeting-Shaw Trustee 30/10/2020
John Edward Shaw trustee 30/10/2020
John White Trustee 17/11/1969

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Quentin Scott Trustee 28/02/2021
Gilda Blanche Ann Aitken Trustee 28/11/2020
Margaret Anne Strid trustee 28/11/2020
Donalyn Kathleen Stanleigh Glover Trustee 21/04/2020
John Macdonald Aitken Trustee 10/03/2020
Peter Howard Trustee 1/06/2019
Ian Mackley Trustee 26/04/2019
Norman Joseph Leach Trustee 26/04/2019
Stephen John Thornley Trustee 26/04/2019
William Nathan Blackburn Trustee 5/05/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/07/2022 NOC022
16/07/2021 NOC018
18/12/2020 NOC017
26/05/2019 NOC013
19/05/2019 NOC012
23/01/2017 NOC009
28/04/2014 NOC007
28/04/2014 NOC006
1/06/2012 AR006

Charity Documents