Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cleft New Zealand Incorporated
Cleft New Zealand
CC21700
9429042613848
Registered

Registration details

10/03/2008
January 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Cleft Lip And Palate Support Group Auckland Incorporated 11/03/2008
Cleft New Zealand Incorporated 25/05/2009

Address for service

PO Box 13385
Onehunga
Auckland
1643
10 Meadowbank Rise
Onehunga
Bethlehem
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

0800425338
www.facebook.com/cleftnz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides advice / information / advocacy. Provides advice and general information regarding cleft, especially to prenatal parents and new parents of cleft children. Runs coffee groups for new parents. Posts a facebook page for parents and teenagers. Provides advocacy for cleft parents and children with regard to the DHB's and Health Department Runs camps for children / young adults from the ages of 10 - 20 years providing support and sharing experiences for teenage aged cleft effected persons.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Other charities, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Medical Professionals

Entity Structure

Incorporated society. Non profit.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2024 31/07/2024 1/07/2024 $22,560 $18,425 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2023 31/07/2023 31/05/2023 $24,272 $47,077 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 7/06/2022 $21,556 $18,433 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 4/05/2021 $28,254 $23,148 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 29/06/2020 $26,101 $25,047 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 18/06/2019 $23,224 $21,664 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 28/06/2018 $17,712 $9,783 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 21/07/2017 $19,619 $18,566 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 26/05/2016 $16,343 $25,021 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2015 31/07/2015 1/08/2015 $17,984 $14,091 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Genevieve Boyer Board Member 12/08/2019
Tracy Harlowe Board Member 2/05/2019
Allison Margaret Brown Secretary 1/02/2018
Andrew Humphrey James Acton-Adams Chairperson 1/02/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Zoe Carson Board Member 8/03/2024
Jemma Lee Cookson Board Member 10/05/2023
Lisa-Karen Kennedy Board Member 19/05/2021
Helen Catherine Mataiti Board Member 9/12/2019
Ian Jensen Treasurer 1/05/2019
Jacqueline Elizabeth Sanders-Jones Deputy Chairperson 1/05/2018
Jaime Campbell Secretary 1/02/2018
Sophie Petley Chairperson 1/02/2018
Kylie Perry Board Member 2/06/2017
Sonali Chandratilake General Manager 1/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/03/2024 NOC035
26/09/2023 NOC034
31/05/2021 NOC031
16/12/2019 NOC028
9/12/2019 NOC027
26/04/2018 NOC024
26/04/2018 NOC023
24/04/2018 NOC022
22/04/2018 NOC021
6/06/2017 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.