Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Roopu Taurima o Manukau Trust
CC21743
9429042825739
Registered

Registration details

12/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 22346
Otahuhu
Auckland
1640
650 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

(09)2766282


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Roopu Taurima is a Kaupapa Maori organisation determined to make a real difference by supporting Tangata to live great lives in their own way.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Health

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Registered Charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/12/2024 $44,174,000 $44,311,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 7/12/2023 $41,658,000 $41,025,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/11/2022 $40,952,000 $38,646,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 5/12/2021 $36,931,000 $36,793,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 19/11/2020 $35,021,000 $35,008,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/11/2019 $34,452,000 $34,224,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 8/11/2018 $33,577,000 $33,712,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 29/11/2017 $31,882,000 $31,671,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 5/10/2017 $30,286,028 $31,083,971 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 7/12/2015 $30,843,011 $29,992,557 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elizabeth Tafau EA to CEO/Board Secretary 10/01/2024
Karen Smith Mana Whakahaere / CEO 15/04/2022
William Karaitiana Trustee 30/11/2021
Ebony Duff Trustee 9/09/2020
Jason Alexander Trustee 9/09/2020
Manu Sione Chairperson 9/09/2020
Sarah Hillier Trustee 30/06/2015
Mahaki Albert Trustee 2/10/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Merepeka Raukawa-Tait Trustee 31/12/2024
Brian Joseph Oshea Trustee 28/11/2023
Andrew Hewett Board Secretary 31/05/2023
Tania Thomas CEO 14/04/2022
Greg Keay Chair of the Finance & Audit Committee 30/11/2021
Marieta Esekielu Board Secretary 31/05/2021
Debbie Renahan Trustee 11/09/2020
Sione Manu Trustee 9/09/2020
Sarah Hillier Trustee 30/05/2018
Andrew Hewett Secretary/EA to CEO 6/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/02/2025 NOC043
16/01/2024 NOC041
13/07/2023 NOC039
27/10/2022 NOC037
4/10/2022 NOC036
3/10/2022 NOC035
30/05/2022 NOC034
6/02/2022 NOC033
12/01/2022 NOC032
25/11/2021 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.