Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Choirs Aotearoa New Zealand Trust
New Zealand Youth Choir, Voices New Zealand Chamber Choir, New Zealand Secondary Students' Choir
CC21921
9429042749684
Registered

Registration details

17/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 25025
Wellington
6140
Flat 2
Level 4
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 499 0692
https://www.facebook.com/nzyouthchoir/
https://twitter.com/ChoirsNZ
https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCIcQGjS-Fti-93iKbbQhQFg


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The principal activity of the Trust is the advancement of choral singing in New Zealand by the administration of three choirs. The three choirs are New Zealand Youth Choir, New Zealand Secondary Students' Choir and Voices New Zealand Chamber Choir. Choirs Aotearoa NZ (CANZ) exists so that people of Aotearoa NZ are inspired to appreciate, participate and excel in Choral singing. Our vision is to be a national organisation that provides for participation, promotes and fosters leadership, and sets the standards of excellence within the choral community in Aotearoa NZ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Choral Performance/Training)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, International activities

General public

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Choirs Aotearoa New Zealand Foundation Trust CC54014

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 2/07/2024 $1,233,383 $1,278,372 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/06/2023 $1,690,776 $1,792,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 27/05/2022 $1,208,777 $1,041,341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 16/04/2021 $924,562 $848,620 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 9/06/2020 $1,482,405 $1,477,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 7/05/2019 $896,933 $847,614 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/06/2018 $673,612 $639,111 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 25/05/2017 $816,033 $793,645 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 14/06/2016 $606,479 $514,266 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Douglas Reeves Trustee 22/02/2025
Nick Tipping Trustee 22/02/2025
Robert Wiremu Trustee 22/02/2025
Gina Claire Rogers Trustee 22/02/2024
Bianca Davidson Trustee 1/07/2023
Richard John Sorrenson Trustee (Chair) 10/09/2020
Warren John Kilham Trustee 10/09/2020
Amanda Clare Barclay Trustee 1/01/2019
Linda Gloria Webb Trustee 1/01/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Diana Cable Trustee 31/12/2024
Katie Macfarlane Trustee 31/12/2022
Richard Jonathan Morland Sim Trustee 31/03/2022
Gary Peter Colquhoun-Petherick Trustee 31/12/2020
Jennifer Ann McGechie Trustee 31/12/2020
Andrea Gray Trustee 12/09/2020
Amanda Susan Reid Trustee 31/12/2019
Les Foy Trustee 31/12/2019
Warwick Malcolm Hugh Mitchell Trustee 31/12/2019
David Hamilton Trustee 6/12/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/04/2025 NOC041
15/03/2024 NOC039
22/11/2023 NOC038
23/02/2021 NOC034
23/02/2021 NOC033
29/09/2020 NOC032
2/04/2020 NOC030
7/05/2019 NOC028
7/05/2019 NOC027
18/02/2019 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.