Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Girl Guides Association New Zealand Incorporated
GirlGuiding New Zealand
CC22069
9429042854852
Registered

Registration details

24/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 13143
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
213 Lichfield Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

0800222292
n/a


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We are a not-for-profit organisation that offers a diverse range of programmes and activities for girls and young women aged 5-18. Our amazing volunteers inspire girls to find their voice and be their best, giving them a space where they can be themselves, have fun, build friendships, gain valuable life skills and make a positive difference to their lives and their communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education, training & recreation for girls 5-18), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Sport / recreation, Youth organisation/Education, training & recreation for girls 5-18

Other (please state)

(Girls 5-18), Children / young people

Entity Structure

Girl Guides Association New Zealand Incorporated (“The Association”) is a public benefit entity for the purposes of financial reporting in accordance with the Financial Reporting Act (2013) and is a charitable organisation registered under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957, Charities Act 2005 and incorporated under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
GirlGuiding New Zealand Foundation CC46160

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 4/06/2024 $4,039,996 $4,406,873 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $4,708,129 $6,979,502 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 28/06/2022 $3,651,246 $5,448,865 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 21/06/2021 $3,330,297 $5,420,050 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 11/06/2020 $5,040,874 $6,887,434 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 9/06/2019 $5,918,612 $7,607,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/05/2018 $7,679,749 $9,162,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 1/06/2017 $5,559,572 $8,342,122 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 3/06/2016 $7,345,220 $6,638,454 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lizzie Marvelly Chief Executive 1/06/2024
Sandra Lee Audit and Finance Chair 2/10/2023
Maia Faulkner Board Chair 17/06/2023
Michelle Cheeseman Board Member 17/06/2023
Vicki Frewin Board Member 17/06/2023
Sacha Michele MacDonald Co-opted Board Member 4/11/2022
Ciara Gibson Board Member 18/06/2022
Cory Gordon Co-opted Board Member 1/07/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Angela Reeve Interim Chief Executive 31/05/2024
Mirjam Oord Deputy Board member 26/05/2024
Lauren McKinnon Chief Executive 31/12/2023
Siva Sivapakkiam Co-opted Board Member 30/11/2023
Adrienne Kenney Board Chair 16/03/2023
Simon Tran Co-opted Board Member 6/03/2023
Hayley Coyne Board Member 2/03/2023
Lauren Kerr McKinnon Chief Executive 16/12/2022
Lynley Lee National Board Member 20/10/2022
Shaun Greaves Co-opted Board Member 31/08/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/06/2024 NOC064
26/01/2024 NOC062
2/10/2023 NOC061
20/06/2023 NOC058
26/05/2023 NOC057
21/03/2023 NOC056
7/03/2023 NOC055
4/11/2022 NOC052
31/10/2022 NOC051
20/10/2022 NOC050
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.