Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Greyhound Adoption Programme Trust
Greyhounds As Pets
CC22080
9429043023066
Registered

Registration details

24/03/2008
July 31

Address for service

1 Brooks Place
Feilding
4702

Charity's other details

021962449
https://www.facebook.com/GAPNZ/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To successfully rehome greyhounds.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Rehoming of retired racing greyhounds)

Care / protection of animals

Sport / recreation

Animals

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

Balance Date of 31 March - This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 28/02/2025 28/02/2025 $780,903 $861,160 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 29/02/2024 27/02/2024 $883,785 $827,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/03/2023 7/03/2023 $697,265 $978,569 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 30/01/2022 $827,646 $647,214 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 11/01/2021 $898,103 $803,080 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $699,379 $690,192 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $752,401 $636,488 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $798,140 $842,596 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/12/2016 $631,311 $681,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 6/10/2016 $538,224 $515,180 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 16 months from 1 April 2019 to 31 July 2020

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michelle Palmer Trustee and co Chair 19/02/2024
Roger Matthews Trustee 19/02/2024
Frederic Guillemont Co Chair 23/11/2023
Jean Fahey Trustee 23/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jo McCauley Co-Chair and Trustee 27/02/2025
Sonya Kahn Trustee 27/02/2025
Pam Madgwick Co-Chair and Trustee 31/07/2024
Alastair Donald Trustee 20/07/2023
Julia Thomas Trustee 10/06/2023
Frederic Guillemont Trustee 6/11/2020
Phil Holden Trustee 31/01/2018
Sean Hannan Trustee 31/01/2018
Elizabeth Lowndes Trustee 5/09/2017
Alastair Ferguson Trustee 31/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2025 NOC042
26/06/2024 NOC041
21/06/2024 NOC040
1/03/2024 NOC039
8/01/2024 NOC037
29/06/2023 NOC036
2/07/2022 NOC034
2/07/2022 NOC033
23/07/2021 NOC030
30/06/2021 NOC029
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.