Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


North Harbour Budgeting Services Incorporated
CC22166
9429043004874
Registered

Registration details

26/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

NORTH HARBOUR BUDGET SERVICE PO Box 300545
Albany
Auckland
752
LION FOUNDATION HOUSE
3 William Laurie Place
Albany
Auckland
632

Charity's other details

09 448 5655
09 448 5653
North Harbour Budgeting Services Inc


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

• Our Mission - Through financial mentoring and education, we aim to improve the lives of those in our community. • Our Vision – To have our community understand the importance of financial literacy and the need to support those experiencing hardship with a supportive and culturally aware service that educates in a way that helps people help themselves. • Our Values – Professionalism, Non-judgmental and respectful, Confidential safe and private, Accountability, Co=operation and Te Tiriti O Waitangi. * What we do - Assist clients to develop basic financial skills through education. Provide support and advocacy for clients. Help negotiate with creditors, if needed. Offer ongoing financial mentoring with the aim of assisting clients to become more self-reliant. Educate through seminars and workshops in schools, workplaces, tertiary institutions, community organisations and other agencies.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering, budgeting

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 2/11/2024 $352,623 $391,505 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 17/11/2023 $291,728 $278,824 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 11/11/2022 $440,687 $277,354 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 17/12/2021 $332,164 $234,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $214,843 $210,880 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $206,875 $203,303 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/12/2018 $181,318 $199,601 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/11/2017 $125,473 $198,937 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 10/03/2017 $154,848 $158,561 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 31/12/2015 $143,894 $151,950 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bruce Richard Grieve Director 22/10/2024
Jennifer Khoo Treasurer 22/10/2024
Joanne Fritha Hacking Deputy Chair 24/10/2023
Marzie Mashouf Director 24/10/2023
Tania Elizabeth Dickie Director 17/05/2022
Robin James Collins Chair 20/07/2021
Shane Cuthbert Secretary 20/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dan Xia Fu Treasurer 22/10/2024
Janet Marshall Director 22/10/2024
Amy Catherine Lewis Board Member 24/10/2023
Peter Bernard Newton Hassell Board Member 27/09/2022
Taryn Lunny Board Member 15/03/2022
Amali Fonseka Board Member 19/10/2021
David Michael Wenham Board Member 19/10/2021
Kerry David Francis Chairperson 19/10/2021
Kate Amanda Armstrong Deputy Chairperson 18/09/2021
Amali Fonseka Treasurer 30/06/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/11/2024 NOC049
2/11/2024 NOC048
28/10/2024 NOC047
9/12/2023 NOC046
18/11/2023 NOC043
28/10/2023 NOC042
23/09/2022 NOC040
31/07/2022 NOC039
26/03/2022 NOC038
27/10/2021 NOC035
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.